Louisiana 2011 2011 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR40 Enrolled / Bill

                    Page 1 of 3
Regular Session, 2011	ENROLLED
SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON NO. 40
BY SENATOR CHEEK 
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON1
To urge and request the Department of Health and Hospitals and the Louisiana Ambulance2
Alliance to work in collaboration through the Emergency Medical Services3
Professional Working Group to meet certain goals and to report to the Senate and4
House committees on health and welfare by February 1, 2012.5
WHEREAS, it is of the utmost importance that the state of Louisiana foster and6
maintain strong emergency services and emergency services professionals who are able to7
work collaboratively in order to successfully address emergency response, emergency8
preparedness, and emergency services; and9
WHEREAS, in order to facilitate a strong and vibrant emergency medical services10
system and professionals, it is imperative that there are clear and easily understandable11
regulations governing the emergency medical services system and profession; and12
WHEREAS, in enacting R.S. 40:1231 et seq., this legislature found that the13
Department of Health and Hospitals, office of public health, bureau of emergency medical14
services, constitutes an invaluable part of the healthcare delivery system of Louisiana; and15
WHEREAS, it is important that nationally required changes to regulations governing16
emergency medical services are incorporated into the Louisiana Revised Statutes before17
January 1, 2014; and18
WHEREAS, with emergency services delivery and emergency preparedness planning19
challenges in the state only increasing, the emergency medical system must move away from20
the traditional structures and develop integrated and collaborative service delivery methods21
which seek to maximize, while still maintaining the highest degree of competency by which22
emergency medical services are provided to the citizens of this state; and 23
WHEREAS, it is essential that the solutions to these challenges be developed through24
a thoughtful and deliberative process.25
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby26
urge and request the Department of Health and Hospitals and the Louisiana Ambulance27 SCR NO. 40	ENROLLED
Page 2 of 3
Alliance to work in collaboration through the Emergency Medical Services Professional1
Working Group to meet certain goals and to report to the Senate and House committees on2
health and welfare by February 1, 2012.3
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Emergency Medical Services Professional4
Working Group is hereby created and shall be composed of the following members who5
shall be appointed no later than July 15, 2011:6
(1) The secretary of the Department of Health and Hospitals or his designee.7
(2) The chief executive officer of the Louisiana Ambulance Alliance or his designee.8
(3) The Department of Health and Hospitals Director of Emergency Preparedness or9
his designee.10
(4) The Louisiana State Fire Marshall or his designee.11
(5) The executive director of the Louisiana Emergency Response Network (LERN)12
or his designee.13
(6) The executive director of the Louisiana Chapter of the American College of14
Emergency Physicians or his designee.15
(7) The chairperson of the Department of Health and Hospitals Emergency Medical16
Services Certification Commission or his designee who is, at a minimum, a state-certified17
emergency medical technician.18
(8) The president of the Louisiana Association of Registered Emergency Medical19
Technicians or his designee, who is, at a minimum, a state-certified emergency medical20
technician.21
(9)  The President of the Louisiana State Firemen’s Association or his designee.22
(10)  The President of the Louisiana Fire Chiefs Association or his designee.23
In addition, the following professionals within the Louisiana Department of Health24
and Hospitals may appoint one representative to the working group to act in an advisory25
capacity only:26
(1) The director of the bureau of emergency medical services, office of public health,27
within the Department of Health and Hospitals.28
(2) The chair of the Ambulance Standards Committee of the Emergency Medical29
Services Task Force.30 SCR NO. 40	ENROLLED
Page 3 of 3
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the initial meeting shall be held no later than1
August 1, 2011, and the Emergency Medical Services Professional Working Group shall2
provide for the manner and frequency of the group's meetings and for all other3
administrative matters necessary in order to function as a working group.4
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the following objectives and goals shall be met5
by the Emergency Medical Services Professional Working Group:6
(1) Develop language for legislation to address nationally required changes to7
Louisiana law governing emergency medical services.8
(2) Discuss and outline additional system recommendations which may improve9
emergency medical services, avoid service duplication and redundancy, and align services10
with currently existing departments within the Department of Health and Hospitals.11
(3) Review, discuss and recommend the most appropriate location and statutory12
structure for the licensure and certification of emergency medical personnel, specifically13
addressing whether the licensing function should remain with the Department of Health and14
Hospitals or be transferred to an independent regulatory board or other more appropriate15
venue as identified by the Emergency Medical Services Professional Working Group. 16
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Emergency Medical Services Professional17
Working Group shall submit a written report of its conclusions and recommendations to the18
Senate and House committees on health and welfare by February 1, 2012. The group shall19
terminate no later than June 30, 2012.20
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to all21
members of the Emergency Medical Services Professional Working Group.22
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF LOUISIANA
APPROVED: