Page 1 of 2 Regular Session, 2011 ENROLLED SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 27 BY SENATOR BROOME A RESOLUTION To commend Camelot College on the occasion of its twenty-fifth anniversary. WHEREAS, Camelot College was founded by Reverend Ronnie L. Williams on May 1, 1986, out of his sincere desire to provide education and career skill training to unemployed and underemployed people in the business and medical industries; and WHEREAS, Camelot College's first classes began on May 12, 1986, in Baton Rouge, Louisiana at 2618 Wooddale Boulevard (Windsor Courts Office Plaza- formerly Bellemont Office Park) through a classroom training contract with the Job Training Partnership Administration; and WHEREAS, the college was licensed by the Louisiana State Department of Education on August 28, 1986, and since that time, the college, through its emphasis on educational excellence and job placement, has educated and placed many graduates into jobs in East Baton Rouge Parish and surrounding areas; and WHEREAS, Camelot College was nationally accredited as a business school by the Accrediting Council for Independent Colleges and Schools on September 12, 1990, and further certified by the United States Department of Education on February 19, 1991; and WHEREAS, the college continues its emphasis on educational excellence and job placement and is established as a vital postsecondary institution in the Southern Region; and WHEREAS, in keeping with its tradition, Camelot College is providing short-term job specific training in medical assistant, cosmetology and cosmetology instructor training; and WHEREAS, Camelot College's student services include on campus student housing, specifically providing accommodations for students who have children under the age of six; an on campus "Class A" child day care center; and a free working wardrobe boutique, and is conveniently located within the service area of the local city transportation system. SR NO. 27 ENROLLED Page 2 of 2 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby recognize and commend Camelot College on its twenty-fifth anniversary. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to Reverend Ronnie L. Williams, President of Camelot College. PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE