Page 1 of 2 Regular Session, 2011 ENROLLED SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 40 BY SENATORS MARIONNEAUX, ADLEY, ALARIO, AMEDEE, APPEL, BROOME, CHABERT, CHAISSON, CHEEK, CLAITOR, CROWE, DONAHUE, DORSEY, ERDEY, GAUTREAUX, GUILLORY, HEITMEIER, JACKSON, KOSTELKA, LAFLEUR, LONG, MARTINY, MCPHERSON, MICHOT, MILLS, MORRELL, MORRISH, MOUNT, MURRAY, NEVERS, PERRY, PETERSON, QUINN, RISER, SHAW, SMITH, THOMPSON, WALSWORTH AND WILLARD-LEWIS A RESOLUTION To express the sincere and heartfelt condolences of the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana to the family of Louisiana National Guard Staff Sergeant William Austin Daniel upon his untimely death due to Hodgkins Lymphoma. WHEREAS, Staff Sergeant Daniel was a native of Baton Rouge, a graduate of LSU Laboratory High School, and attended Southeastern Louisiana University; and WHEREAS, Staff Sergeant Daniel loved LSU football, LSU baseball, fishing, boating, golfing, hunting, guns, and especially the military; and WHEREAS, Staff Sergeant Daniel served in the United States Army from September 22, 1997, to January 11, 2000, and he served in the Louisiana National Guard from January 12, 2000, to September 7, 2009; and WHEREAS, Staff Sergeant Daniel proudly served his country in Operation Iraqi Freedom with the 256 th Infantry Brigade of Lafayette from May 15, 2004, to November 5, 2005, and received numerous military awards and decorations, including the Combat Infantryman's Badge for engaging enemy forces as an infantryman, and the most noteworthy Meritorious Service Medal and Army Commendation Medal; and WHEREAS, in addition to running patrols, Staff Sergeant Daniel was chosen to train Iraqi Troops in infantry procedures, and was also chosen to train troops in Thailand; and WHEREAS, Staff Sergeant Daniel participated in National Guard Response and Relief efforts in support of the people of Louisiana, and was a member of the Louisiana National Guard's Honor Guard; and WHEREAS, Staff Sergeant Daniel was diagnosed with Hodgkins Lymphoma in November 2008, and he never lost his loving nature or contagious smile that was always on his face even through the rigors of chemotherapy and his disease; and SR NO. 40 ENROLLED Page 2 of 2 WHEREAS, Staff Sergeant Daniel, a proud and courageous soldier, was as brave in battle as he was in his fight against cancer, however he succumbed to the disease; and WHEREAS, Staff Sergeant Daniel passed away at the age of thirty-three on September 7, 2009, and was buried on September 11, 2009, with full military honors; and WHEREAS, Staff Sergeant Daniel brought laughter and love to many lives, hope to the Iraqi people, honor to his family, the State of Louisiana, and the United States of America; and WHEREAS, Staff Sergeant Daniel, known as "Austin" to family and friends is a true American hero whose bravery and sacrifice will never be forgotten, and is sorely missed by everyone who knew and loved him; and WHEREAS, Staff Sergeant Daniel made sure of two things before his short time on Earth was through, that his family would be taken care of, and that he lived life to the fullest; his greatest accomplishment was his beloved three-year-old daughter Anna Lee, who will always remember, admire, and love her "daddy"; and WHEREAS, Staff Sergeant Daniel was a loved husband, father, son, grandson, brother, friend, and soldier, and is loved and dearly missed by his family, especially his wife, Jill Evans Daniel, daughter, Anna Lee Daniel, parents Randal and Alice Daniel, friends, and brother soldiers who will keep his memory alive forever. THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby extend its deepest and most profound condolences to the family of Louisiana National Guard Staff Sergeant William Austin Daniel for their great loss and for his faithful service to his country and nation. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the family of Staff Sergeant William Austin Daniel. PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE