HLS 12RS-236 ENGROSSED Page 1 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. Regular Session, 2012 HOUSE BILL NO. 327 BY REPRESENTATIVE RICHARD PUBLIC CONTRACTS: Provides for a 10% reduction of all state professional, personal, and consulting service contracts AN ACT1 To enact Subpart G of Part I of Chapter 16 of Subtitle III of Title 39 of the Louisiana2 Revised Statutes of 1950, to be comprised of R.S. 39:1493.11, relative to3 professional, personal, and consulting services procurement; to require a reduction4 in the dollar amount of certain professional, personal, and consulting service5 contracts; to provide for the submission of periodic reports; to provide for6 exceptions; to provide for an effective date; and to provide for related matters.7 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:8 Section 1. Subpart G of Part I of Chapter 16 of Subtitle III of Title 39 of the9 Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950, comprised of R.S. 39:1493.11, is hereby enacted to read10 as follows: 11 SUBPART G. REDUCTION OF CONTRACTS FOR FISCAL YEAR 2012-201312 ยง1493.11. Reduction of contracts for Fiscal Year 2012-201313 A.(1) The total dollar amount for professional, personal, and consulting14 service contracts under the jurisdiction of the office of contractual review for Fiscal15 Year 2012-2013 shall be reduced by no less than ten percent of the total dollar16 amount for such contracts for Fiscal Year 2011-2012.17 (2) The office of contractual review shall submit reports on the status of the18 implementation of this Section to the Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget on19 October 1, 2012, January 1, 2013, April 1, 2013, and July 1, 2013.20 HLS 12RS-236 ENGROSSED HB NO. 327 Page 2 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. B. The office of contractual review shall not approve any contract if such1 approval would increase the total dollar amount of contracts as required in2 Subsection A of this Section, unless such contract meets all of the following criteria:3 (1) Either no employee of the contracting department or agency is both4 competent and available to perform the services called for by the proposed contract5 or the services called for are not the type readily susceptible to being performed by6 persons who are employed by the state on a continuing basis.7 (2) The services are not available as a product of a prior or existing contract.8 (3) The contracting department or agency has submitted to the office of9 contractual review a written plan to monitor and evaluate the performance called for10 in the proposed contract.11 (4) It is more cost effective to obtain the proposed services through the12 contract than to have the services provided by the contracting department or agency13 if the department or agency can provide the services or by agreement with another14 state department or agency.15 (5) The commissioner of administration determines that the proposed contract16 represents a priority expenditure for Louisiana state government.17 Section 2. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2012; if vetoed by the governor18 and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on July 1,19 2012, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.20 DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] Richard HB No. 327 Abstract: Requires a 10% reduction in the total dollar amount for professional, personal, and consulting service contracts under the jurisdiction of the office of contractual review for FY 2012-2013. Proposed law requires a 10% reduction in the total dollar amount for professional, personal, and consulting service contracts under the jurisdiction of the office of contractual review for FY 2012-2013. HLS 12RS-236 ENGROSSED HB NO. 327 Page 3 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. Proposed law requires the office of contractual review to submit reports on the status of the implementation of proposed law to the Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget on Oct. 1, 2012, Jan. 1, 2013, April 1, 2013, and July 1, 2013. Proposed law prohibits the office of contractual review from approving any contract if such approval would increase the total dollar amount of contracts above the reduction required in proposed law, unless such contract meets all of the following criteria: (1)Either no employee of the contracting department or agency is both competent and available to perform the services called for by the proposed contract or the services called for are not the type readily susceptible to being performed by persons who are employed by the state on a continuing basis. (2)The services are not available as a product of a prior or existing contract. (3)The contracting department or agency has submitted to the office of contractual review a written plan to monitor and evaluate the performance called for in the proposed contract. (4)It is more cost effective to obtain the proposed services through the contract than to have the services provided by the contracting department or agency if the department or agency can provide the services or by agreement with another state department or agency. (5)The commissioner of administration determines that the proposed contract represents a priority expenditure for La. state government. Effective July 1, 2012. (Adds R.S. 39:1493.11)