Louisiana 2012 2012 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB373 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 12RS-803	ENGROSSED
Page 1 of 3
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Regular Session, 2012
HOUSE BILL NO. 373
BY REPRESENTATIVE TIM BURNS
SUNSET LAW:  Re-creates the Department of State Civil Service
AN ACT1
To enact R.S. 49:191(5)(n) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(4)(g), relative to the Department of2
State Civil Service, including provisions to provide for the re-creation of the3
Department of State Civil Service and the statutory entities made a part of the4
department by law; to provide for the effective termination date for all statutory5
authority for the existence of such statutory entities; and to provide for related6
matters.7
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:8
Section 1.  Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of State Civil Service and the9
statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective June 30,10
2012, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with the provisions of11
Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.12
Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of State Civil13
Service and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created by Section 114
of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2015, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However, the Department15
of State Civil Service may be re-created prior to such date in accordance with the provisions16
of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.17
Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that18
those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.19 HLS 12RS-803	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 373
Page 2 of 3
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Section 4.  R.S. 49:191(5)(n) is hereby enacted to read as follows: 1
ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase-2
out period for statutory entities; table of dates3
Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the4
legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their5
operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority6
for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of7
July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:8
*          *          *9
(5)  July 1, 2014:10
*          *          *11
(n) The Department of State Civil Service and all statutory entities made a12
part of the department by law.13
Section 5.  R.S. 49:191(4)(g) is hereby repealed in its entirety.14
Section 6.  This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2012; if vetoed by the15
governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on16
June 30, 2012, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.17
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Tim Burns	HB No. 373
Abstract: Re-creates the Dept. of State Civil Service for two more years.  Changes
termination date from July 1, 2013, to July 1, 2015.
Present law (sunset law) provides that the Dept. of State Civil Service and all the statutory
entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on
July 1, 2012, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2013,
unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its
statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of State Civil Service and its
statutory entities, effective June 30, 2012, in accordance with the sunset law. Supersedes the
provisions of the sunset law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and
which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along
with additional provisions. July 1, 2015, is the new termination date, and termination would
begin July 1, 2014, unless the department is again re-created. HLS 12RS-803	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 373
Page 3 of 3
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Effective June 30, 2012.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(5)(n); Repeals R.S. 49:191(4)(g))