Louisiana 2012 2012 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB640 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 12RS-1228	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 3
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Regular Session, 2012
HOUSE BILL NO. 640
BY REPRESENTATIVE GIROD JACKSON
CULTURE/REC/TOUR DEPT:  Re-creates the Dept. of Culture, Recreation and Tourism
AN ACT1
To enact R.S. 49:191(6) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(4)(c), relative to the Department of2
Culture, Recreation and Tourism, including provisions to provide for the re-creation3
of the Department of Culture, Recreation and Tourism and the statutory entities4
made a part of the department by law; to provide for the effective termination date5
for all statutory authority for the existence of such statutory entities; and to provide6
for related matters.7
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:8
Section 1. Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of Culture, Recreation and9
Tourism and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created10
effective June 30, 2012, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with11
the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.12
Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of Culture,13
Recreation and Tourism and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created14
by Section 1 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2017, pursuant to R.S. 49:191.  However,15
the Department of Culture, Recreation and Tourism may be re-created prior to such date in16
accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised17
Statutes of 1950.18
Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that19
those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.20 HLS 12RS-1228	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 640
Page 2 of 3
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Section 4.  R.S. 49:191(6) is hereby enacted to read as follows:1
ยง191.  Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase2
out period for statutory entities; table of dates3
Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the4
legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their5
operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority6
for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of7
July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:8
*          *          *9
(6)  July 1, 2016:10
(a) The Department of Culture, Recreation and Tourism and all statutory11
entities made a part of the department by law.12
Section 5.  R.S. 49:191(4)(c) is hereby repealed in its entirety.13
Section 6. This Act shall become effective upon signature by the governor or, if not14
signed by the governor, upon expiration of the time for bills to become law without signature15
by the governor, as provided by Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Louisiana.  If16
vetoed by the governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become17
effective on the day following such approval.18
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Girod Jackson	HB No. 640
Abstract: Re-creates the Dept. of Culture, Recreation and Tourism for four more years.
Changes termination date from July 1, 2013, to July 1, 2017.
Present law (Sunset law) provides that the Dept. of Culture, Recreation and Tourism and all
the statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their
operations on July 1, 2012, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as
of July 1, 2013, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the
department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Culture, Recreation and
Tourism and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2012, in accordance with the "Sunset"
law. Supercedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure for review
and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the HLS 12RS-1228	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 640
Page 3 of 3
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
department along with additional provisions. July 1, 2017, is the new termination date, and
termination would begin July 1, 2016, unless the department is again re-created.
Effective June 30, 2012.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(6); Repeals R.S. 49:191(4)(c))