HLS 12RS-1934 ORIGINAL Page 1 of 3 Regular Session, 2012 HOUSE RESOLUTION NO. 37 BY REPRESENTATIVE ARNOLD MILITARY AFFAIRS: Commends the U.S. Coast Guard for its American War of 1812 Revenue Cutter Service A RESOLUTION1 To commend the United States Coast Guard for its American War of 1812 Revenue Cutter2 Service.3 WHEREAS, in 1790, congress established the United States Revenue Cutter Service4 and commissioned armed ocean-going vessels to enforce tariff and maritime law; the5 Revenue Cutter Service was the forerunner of the United States Coast Guard, the oldest6 continuous federal authority engaged in service on the seas; and7 WHEREAS, on June 18, 1804, the United States Treasury Department authorized8 the Baltimore customs collector to build a cutter for the newly acquired port of New Orleans9 and the cutter, known as revenue cutter Louisiana, set sail for New Orleans on December10 16, 1804, and served out of New Orleans; and11 WHEREAS, President James Madison declared war on Great Britain on June 18,12 1812, and the "Second War of American Independence" was fought between the United13 States and Great Britain from June 18, 1812, through February 18, 1815, in Virginia and14 Maryland, and along the Canadian border, the western frontier, the Gulf Coast, and through15 naval engagements on the Great Lakes and the Atlantic and Pacific oceans; and16 WHEREAS, on August 11, 1812, the Louisiana capsized in its home port of New17 Orleans during a severe hurricane and with the Louisiana, half of the vessels in the harbor,18 including flatboats, barges, and trading canoes were all destroyed along with their cargo; and19 WHEREAS, commanding an armed party and small boat on Saturday, October 10,20 1812, Angus O. Frazer (formerly master of Louisiana) apprehended armed smugglers and21 HLS 12RS-1934 ORIGINAL HR NO. 37 Page 2 of 3 their delivery boat near Barataria Bay. The smugglers managed to escape only to return the1 next day to capture Frazer, his men, and the boat. Frazer and his men escaped the2 smugglers; and3 WHEREAS, on October 2, 1813, New Orleans District vessel certificates indicate4 that former revenue cutter Louisiana was salvaged and converted into a merchant vessel; and5 WHEREAS, the American War of 1812, ended with the signing of the Treaty of6 Ghent on December 24, 1814, although word of the treaty did not reach the United States7 until after the Battle of New Orleans on January 8, 1815, where Americans defeated a British8 army in the last major land engagement of the war; and9 WHEREAS, the American War of 1812 helped forge a national identity among the10 American states and laid the groundwork for a national system of homeland defense and a11 professional military within the United States; and12 WHEREAS, the observance of the bicentennial of this important war provides an13 opportunity for all Americans to remember the sacrifices and contributions of the revenue14 cutters and to appreciate and celebrate the independence for which valiant soldiers and15 sailors courageously fought; and 16 WHEREAS, it is fitting and appropriate to also commemorate the revenue cutter17 Louisiana, a vessel of the Revenue Cutter Service and its soldiers and sailors for bravery18 during the American War of 1812, and specifically for their defense against the smugglers19 in the Barataria Bay area.20 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the21 Legislature of Louisiana does hereby commend the United States Coast Guard for its22 American War of 1812 Revenue Cutter Service and especially those soldiers and sailors who23 served on the revenue cutter Louisiana.24 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a suitable copy of this Resolution be transmitted25 to Rear Admiral Roy Nash, Eighth District Commandant of the United States Coast Guard.26 HLS 12RS-1934 ORIGINAL HR NO. 37 Page 3 of 3 DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] Arnold HR No. 37 Commends the U.S. Coast Guard for its American War of 1812 Revenue Cutter Service.