Louisiana 2012 2012 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR37 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 12RS-1934	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 3
Regular Session, 2012
HOUSE RESOLUTION NO. 37
BY REPRESENTATIVE ARNOLD
MILITARY AFFAIRS: Commends the U.S. Coast Guard for its American War of 1812
Revenue Cutter Service
A RESOLUTION1
To commend the United States Coast Guard for its American War of 1812 Revenue Cutter2
Service.3
WHEREAS, in 1790, congress established the United States Revenue Cutter Service4
and commissioned armed ocean-going vessels to enforce tariff and maritime law; the5
Revenue Cutter Service was the forerunner of the United States Coast Guard, the oldest6
continuous federal authority engaged in service on the seas; and7
WHEREAS, on June 18, 1804, the United States Treasury Department authorized8
the Baltimore customs collector to build a cutter for the newly acquired port of New Orleans9
and the cutter, known as revenue cutter Louisiana, set sail for New Orleans on December10
16, 1804, and served out of New Orleans; and11
WHEREAS, President James Madison declared war on Great Britain on June 18,12
1812, and the "Second War of American Independence" was fought between the United13
States and Great Britain from June 18, 1812, through February 18, 1815, in Virginia and14
Maryland, and along the Canadian border, the western frontier, the Gulf Coast, and through15
naval engagements on the Great Lakes and the Atlantic and Pacific oceans; and16
WHEREAS, on August 11, 1812, the Louisiana capsized in its home port of New17
Orleans during a severe hurricane and with the Louisiana, half of the vessels in the harbor,18
including flatboats, barges, and trading canoes were all destroyed along with their cargo; and19
WHEREAS, commanding an armed party and small boat on Saturday, October 10,20
1812, Angus O. Frazer (formerly master of 	Louisiana) apprehended armed smugglers and21 HLS 12RS-1934	ORIGINAL
HR NO. 37
Page 2 of 3
their delivery boat near Barataria Bay. The smugglers managed to escape only to return the1
next day to capture Frazer, his men, and the boat.  Frazer and his men escaped the2
smugglers; and3
WHEREAS, on October 2, 1813, New Orleans District vessel certificates indicate4
that former revenue cutter Louisiana was salvaged and converted into a merchant vessel; and5
WHEREAS, the American War of 1812, ended with the signing of the Treaty of6
Ghent on December 24, 1814, although word of the treaty did not reach the United States7
until after the Battle of New Orleans on January 8, 1815, where Americans defeated a British8
army in the last major land engagement of the war; and9
WHEREAS, the American War of 1812 helped forge a national identity among the10
American states and laid the groundwork for a national system of homeland defense and a11
professional military within the United States; and12
WHEREAS, the observance of the bicentennial of this important war provides an13
opportunity for all Americans to remember the sacrifices and contributions of the revenue14
cutters and to appreciate and celebrate the independence for which valiant soldiers and15
sailors courageously fought; and 16
WHEREAS, it is fitting and appropriate to also commemorate the revenue cutter17
Louisiana, a vessel of the Revenue Cutter Service and its soldiers and sailors for bravery18
during the American War of 1812, and specifically for their defense against the smugglers19
in the Barataria Bay area.20
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the21
Legislature of Louisiana does hereby commend the United States Coast Guard for its22
American War of 1812 Revenue Cutter Service and especially those soldiers and sailors who23
served on the revenue cutter Louisiana.24
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a suitable copy of this Resolution be transmitted25
to Rear Admiral Roy Nash, Eighth District Commandant of the United States Coast Guard.26 HLS 12RS-1934	ORIGINAL
HR NO. 37
Page 3 of 3
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Arnold	HR No. 37
Commends the U.S. Coast Guard for its American War of 1812 Revenue Cutter Service.