Louisiana 2012 2012 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB624 Engrossed / Bill

                    SLS 12RS-267	REENGROSSED
Page 1 of 4
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
Regular Session, 2012
SENATE BILL NO. 624
BY SENATOR MURRAY 
CLERKS OF COURT RET.  Provides relative to reemployment of retirees. (6/30/12)
AN ACT1
To amend and reenact R.S. 11:1513, relative to the Clerks' of Court Retirement and Relief2
Fund; to provide for reemployment of retirees; to provide for an effective date; and3
to provide for related matters.4
Notice of intention to introduce this Act has been published.5
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:6
Section 1.  R.S. 11:1513 is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows: 7
ยง1513. Reemployment of a retiree 8
A. Except as provided in Subsection B of this Section, a retiree receiving9
retirement benefits from the system may be temporarily reemployed by a clerk, but10
the retiree shall not be or become a member of the system during such11
reemployment. If the retiree is reemployed in any capacity for more than sixty12
working days, or the equivalent thereof, during any calendar year, the benefits13
payable to the retiree shall be reduced by the amount he earned after sixty working14
days, or the equivalent thereof. The retiree and the clerk shall immediately notify the15
board of the date of reemployment, the amount of salary paid, any changes in salary,16
the number of hours employed per week, the estimated duration of reemployment,17 SB NO. 624
SLS 12RS-267	REENGROSSED
Page 2 of 4
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
and the date of the termination of the reemployment. If the retiree dies during1
reemployment, benefits shall be paid to any other person as if death occurred2
regardless of reemployment pursuant to any option which may have been selected3
by the retiree at the time of retirement.4
B.(1) A retiree who has terminated employment and was receiving retirement5
benefits from the system on January 1, 2007, may be temporarily reemployed by a6
clerk whose office is located in a parish designated under the Robert T. Stafford7
Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act as eligible for individual assistance,8
or individual assistance and public assistance following hurricane Katrina or Rita;9
however, the retiree shall not be or become a member of the system during such10
reemployment. If the retiree is reemployed by such a clerk in any capacity for more11
than one hundred eighty working days, or the equivalent thereof, during any calendar12
year, the benefits payable to the retiree shall be reduced by the amount he earned13
after one hundred eighty working days, or the equivalent thereof. The retiree and the14
clerk shall immediately notify the board of the date of reemployment, the amount of15
salary paid, any changes in salary, the number of hours employe d per week, the16
estimated duration of reemployment, and the date of the termination of the17
reemployment. If the retiree dies during reemployment, benefits shall be paid to any18
other person as if death occurred regardless of reemployment pursuant to any option19
which may have been selected by the retiree at the time of retirement.20
(2) The Except as provided in Subsection C of this Section regarding21
certain retirees reemployed by the clerk of the Orleans Parish Civil District22
Court, the provisions of Paragraph (1) of this Subsection shall expire on July 1,23
2012, and thereafter shall be null and void and of no effect.24
C.(1) The provisions of Paragraph (B)(1) of this Section shall apply to25
any retiree who is reemployed by the clerk of the Orleans Parish Civil District26
Court on or before June 30, 2012.27
(2) The provisions of this Subsection shall expire on July 1, 2013, and28
thereafter shall be null and void and of no effect.29 SB NO. 624
SLS 12RS-267	REENGROSSED
Page 3 of 4
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
D.(1) A retiree who has terminated employment and was receiving1
retirement benefits from the system on January 1, 2007, and who was2
temporarily reemployed by the clerk of the Orleans Parish Civil District Court3
on or before June 30, 2012, may work for a period of ninety working days, or4
the equivalent thereof, during the calendar year. 5
(2) The provisions of this Subsection shall expire on July 1, 2014, and6
thereafter shall be null and void and of no effect.7
Section 2. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2012; if vetoed by the8
governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on9
June 30, 2012, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.10
The original instrument was prepared by Laura Gail Sullivan. The following
digest, which does not constitute a part of the legislative instrument, was
prepared by Cathy R. Wells.
DIGEST
Murray (SB 624)
Present law, applicable to the Clerks' of Court Retirement and Relief Fund, provides for the
reemployment of retirees.  Provides that, except as otherwise provided in present law, a
retiree receiving retirement benefits from the system may be temporarily reemployed by a
clerk, but the retiree shall not be or become a member of the system during such
reemployment. 
Present law further provides that if the retiree is reemployed in any capacity for more than
the equivalent of 60 working days during any calendar year, the retirement benefits shall be
reduced by the amount he earned after 60 working days.
Proposed law retains present law.
Present law provides that, for a retiree temporarily reemployed by a clerk whose office is
located in a parish designated under the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency
Assistance Act as eligible for individual assistance, or individual assistance and public
assistance following hurricane Katrina or Rita, the reduction in benefits does not begin until
the retiree has been reemployed for more than the equivalent of 180 working days during
any calendar year. Further provides that this provision of present law shall expire on July
1, 2012, and thereafter shall be null and void and of no effect.
Proposed law retains present law for retirees reemployed by any clerk whose office is
located in a parish other than Orleans.
Proposed law extends present law, allowing for reemployment for 180 days before benefit
reduction begins, for any retiree who is reemployed by the Clerk of the Orleans Civil District
Court on or before June 30, 2012.
Proposed law provides that proposed law shall expire on July 1, 2013, and thereafter shall
be null and void and of no effect. SB NO. 624
SLS 12RS-267	REENGROSSED
Page 4 of 4
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
Proposed law provides that any retiree who terminated employment and who was receiving
retirement benefits from the Clerks' of Court Retirement and Relief Fund on January 1, 2007,
and who was temporarily reemployed by the clerk of the Orleans Parish Civil District Court
on or before June 30, 2012, may work for a period of 90 working days, or the equivalent
thereof, during the calendar year. Further provides that this provision of proposed law shall
expire on July 1, 2014, and thereafter shall be null and void and of no effect.
Effective June 30, 2012.
(Amends R.S. 11:1513)
Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate
Senate Floor Amendments to engrossed bill
1. Changes the expiration date from July 1, 2015, to July 1, 2013, for those
retirees employed for 180 days before benefit reduction begins.
2. Provides reemployment restrictions on certain employees who were receiving
benefits on January 1, 2007, and who were temporarily reemployed on or
before June 30, 2012.
3. Provides for an expiration date of July 1, 2014, on such restriction