ENROLLED Page 1 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. Regular Session, 2013 HOUSE BILL NO. 348 BY REPRESENTATIVE ARNOLD Prefiled pursuant to Article III, Section 2(A)(4)(b)(i) of the Constitution of Louisiana. AN ACT1 To amend and reenact R.S. 9:173(A) and to enact R.S. 9:154.2, 171(C), and 173(C), relative2 to the Uniform Unclaimed Property Act; to declare certain funds as abandoned3 unclaimed property; to provide for disposition of certain abandoned unclaimed4 funds; to create the Geaux Pass Transition Fund as a special fund in the state treasury5 and provide for the disposition of monies in the fund; to limit the time within which6 to bring certain actions; to limit the time required to retain certain records; and to7 provide for related matters.8 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:9 Section 1. R.S. 9:154.2 is hereby enacted to read as follows:10 §154.2. Crescent City Connection; Geaux Pass accounts and deposits; tolls; Geaux11 Pass Transition Fund; disposition12 A. Notwithstanding the provisions of R.S. 9:154 or any other provision of13 law to the contrary, the provisions of this Section shall apply to account balances and14 toll tag deposits for all Geaux Pass accounts with the primary designation of the15 Crescent City Connection Bridge that have had no activity on Louisiana Highway16 1 since July 1, 2012, and all tolls paid to cross the Crescent City Connection Bridge17 for the period beginning January 1, 2013, and continuing through March 5, 2013.18 B. On July 1, 2013, any monetary funds remaining in any Geaux Pass19 account, any monetary funds remaining for toll tag deposits for all Geaux Pass20 accounts with the primary designation of the Crescent City Connection Bridge that21 have had no activity on Louisiana Highway 1 on or after July 1, 2012, and any22 monetary funds paid as a toll to cross the Crescent City Connection Bridge from23 ENROLLEDHB NO. 348 Page 2 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. January 1, 2013, through March 5, 2013, and which monetary funds have not been1 claimed by any person as of June 15, 2013, shall be deemed abandoned funds for the2 purposes of treatment as unclaimed property in accordance with the provisions of3 this Section.4 C. Funds that are deemed abandoned funds pursuant to this Section shall be5 immediately reported and transferred from the Department of Transportation and6 Development to the state treasurer in his capacity as administrator of the Uniform7 Unclaimed Property Act. The state treasurer shall deposit these funds into the Geaux8 Pass Transition Fund as provided in this Section, and shall through June 30, 2014,9 provide for the return of such funds to their owners in accordance with the Uniform10 Unclaimed Property Act. The state treasurer shall further provide for the payment of11 all unexpended and unencumbered funds remaining in the Geaux Pass Transition12 Fund on June 30, 2014, in accordance with the provisions of this Section.13 D.(1) There is hereby created the Geaux Pass Transition Fund as a special14 fund in the state treasury, hereinafter referred to as the "fund". The source of monies15 for the fund shall be the monies transferred from the Department of Transportation16 and Development to the state treasurer in his capacity as administrator of the17 Uniform Unclaimed Property Act pursuant to the provisions of this Section.18 (2) After compliance with the requirements of Article VII, Section 9(B) of19 the Constitution of Louisiana, relative to the Bond Security and Redemption Fund,20 an amount equal to that deposited into the state treasury from the foregoing sources21 shall be deposited in and credited to the fund. The monies in the fund shall be22 invested by the treasurer in the same manner as the state general fund, and interest23 earnings shall be deposited into the fund.24 (3) All unexpended and unencumbered monies remaining in the fund on June25 30, 2014, shall be appropriated as follows:26 (a) An amount not to exceed thirty percent of the monies in the fund shall be27 appropriated to the Department of Transportation and Development for operational28 and maintenance costs for the New Orleans ferries, formerly operated by its Crescent29 City Connection Division.30 ENROLLEDHB NO. 348 Page 3 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. (b) The balance of the monies in the fund as of June 30, 2014, shall be1 appropriated to the New Orleans Regional Planning Commission for lighting of the2 eastbank and westbank approaches to the Crescent City Connection Bridge,3 including General DeGaulle and the Westbank Expressway approach through ground4 level, improvements to ingress and egress points, lighting, maintenance, grass5 cutting, and landscaping of the Westbank Expressway and its connecting arteries.6 (c) The state treasurer shall be relieved of all liability which may arise with7 respect to such distribution of funds.8 E. All data associated with funds transferred to the state treasurer pursuant9 to this Section shall be provided to the Unclaimed Property Division in an electronic10 format as designated by such division.11 F. For the purposes of this Section, holder requirements under R.S. 9:15912 shall be deemed waived and the Department of Transportation and Development13 shall be deemed a holder in good faith pursuant to provisions of the Uniform14 Unclaimed Property Act.15 G. The state treasurer in his capacity as administrator of the Uniform16 Unclaimed Property Act may establish policies and procedures as necessary to17 implement the provisions of this Section.18 H. All books, papers, and records transferred to the state treasurer pursuant19 to this Section or as a result of the Act originating as House Bill 348 of the 201320 Regular Session of the Legislature shall be retained for a period of no less than five21 years following such transfer.22 I. The provisions of this Section shall supersede and control to the extent of23 conflict with any other provision of law.24 Section 2. R.S. 9:173(A) is hereby amended and reenacted and R.S. 9:171(C) and25 173(C) are hereby enacted to read as follows: 26 §171. Periods of limitation27 * * *28 C. Notwithstanding the provisions of this Section or any other law to the29 contrary, an action or proceeding by the administrator to enforce the provisions of30 ENROLLEDHB NO. 348 Page 4 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. this Chapter shall not be maintained against a federally insured financial institution1 for any violation that occurred more than six years prior to the most recently2 completed auditable period which ends on June thirtieth of each year as provided by3 R.S. 9:159(D).4 * * *5 §173. Retention of records6 A. A holder required to file a report under R.S. 9:159 shall maintain its7 records containing the information required to be included in the report until the8 holder files the report and for ten years after the date of filing, unless a shorter time9 is provided in Subsection B or C of this Section or by rule of the administrator.10 * * *11 C.(1) A federally insured financial institution shall maintain its report filed12 pursuant to R.S. 9:159 for six years after the date the report is filed.13 (2) For purposes of this Chapter, a federally insured financial institution shall14 maintain its records containing the information required to be included in the report15 until the holder files the report and for six years after the date of filing.16 Section 3. The provisions of Section 1 and this Section of this Act shall become17 effective upon signature by the governor or, if not signed by the governor, upon expiration18 of the time for bills to become law without signature by the governor, as provided by Article19 III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Louisiana. If vetoed by the governor and subsequently20 approved by the legislature, the provisions of Section 1and this Section of this Act shall21 become effective on the day following such approval.22 SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATI VES PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF LOUISIANA APPROVED: