HLS 13RS-1006 REENGROSSED Page 1 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. Regular Session, 2013 HOUSE BILL NO. 358 BY REPRESENTATIVES ABRAMSON, WESLEY BI SHOP, JOHNSON, RITCHIE, STOKES, PATRICK WILLIAMS, AND WILLMOTT TAX CREDITS: Removes the Jan. 1, 2015, sunset date for issuance of sound recording investor tax credits and provides a threshold for Louisiana residents AN ACT1 To amend and reenact R.S. 47:6023(C)(1), relative to tax credits; to provide relative to the2 sound recording investor tax credit; to extend the time period in which tax credits3 may be granted; to provide for base investment for resident investors; and to provide4 for related matters.5 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:6 Section 1. R.S. 47:6023(C)(1) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows:7 ยง6023. Sound recording investor tax credits8 * * *9 C. Investor tax credit; state-certified productions and infrastructure projects.10 (1) Until January 1, 2015 January 1, 2020, there is hereby authorized a credit11 against the state income tax for investments made in state-certified productions and12 state-certified sound recording infrastructure projects. The tax credit shall be earned13 by investors at the time expenditures are certified by the Louisiana Department of14 Economic Development according to the total base investment certified for the sound15 recording production company per calendar year; however, no credit shall be allowed16 under this Section for any expenditures for which a credit was granted under R.S.17 47:6007. For state-certified productions certified on and after July 1, 2007, and18 state-certified infrastructure projects which have applied on or before August 1,19 HLS 13RS-1006 REENGROSSED HB NO. 358 Page 2 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. 2009, each investor shall be allowed a tax credit of twenty-five percent of the base1 investment made by that investor in excess of fifteen thousand dollars or, if a2 resident of this state, in excess of five thousand dollars.3 * * *4 DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] Abramson HB No. 358 Abstract: Extends the sunset date for issuance of sound recording tax credits from Jan. 1, 2015 to Jan. 1, 2020, and reduces the threshold above which La. residents are entitled to a credit. Present law provides for the issuance of tax credits, until Jan. 1, 2015, against state income tax for investments made in state-certified productions and state-certified musical recording infrastructure projects. The tax credit shall be earned by investors at the time expenditures are certified by the Dept. of Economic Development according to the total base investment certified for the sound recording production company per calendar year. Present law prohibits a sound recording company from earning a tax credit for which a credit was granted for motion picture tax credits. Present law provides that the sound recording tax credit expires on Jan. 1, 2015. Proposed law retains present law but changes the sunset date to Jan. 1, 2020. Present law further authorizes a tax credit for 25% of the base investment of an investor made by that investor in excess of $15,000 for state-certified productions certified on and after July 1, 2007, and state-certified infrastructure projects certified on or before Aug. 1, 2009. Proposed law reduces the threshold to $5,000 for La. residents. (Amends R.S. 47:6023(C)(1)) Summary of Amendments Adopted by House House Floor Amendments to the engrossed bill. 1. Extends authorization for tax credits to Jan. 1, 2020.