HLS 13RS-1050 ORIGINAL Page 1 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. Regular Session, 2013 HOUSE BILL NO. 474 BY REPRESENTATIVE STUART BISHOP ENERGY/DRILLING: Provides relative to the exemption from severance tax for inactive wells AN ACT1 To amend and reenact R.S. 47:633(7)(c)(iv) and (aa), relative to severance tax on oil and2 gas; to provide relative to a reduced tax rate on oil produced from a well classified3 as inactive; and to provide for related matters.4 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:5 Section 1. R.S. 47:633(7)(c)(iv) and (aa) are hereby amended and reenacted to read6 as follows:7 ยง633. Rates of tax8 The taxes on natural resources severed from the soil or water levied by R.S.9 47:631 shall be predicated on the quantity or value of the products or resources10 severed and shall be paid at the following rates:11 * * *12 (7)13 * * *14 (c)15 * * *16 (iv) Production from oil and gas wells which have been returned to service17 after being inactive for two or more years or having thirty days or less of production18 during the past two years shall be exempt from subject to a severance tax of six and19 one-fourth percent of its value for a period of five ten years when returned to service20 HLS 13RS-1050 ORIGINAL HB NO. 474 Page 2 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. after being inactive for two or more years or having thirty days or less of production1 during the past two years. The exemption time period for the reduced tax rate shall2 be extended by the length of any inactivity of a well that has commenced production3 when such inactivity is caused by a force majeure.4 (aa) To qualify for inactive well status, an application for a two-year inactive5 well certification shall be made to the Department of Natural Resources, before6 commencement of production, during the period beginning July 31, 1994 and ending7 June 30, 2000, for the period beginning July 1, 2002 and ending June 30, 2006, and8 for the period beginning July 1, 2006 and ending June 30, 2010. Upon certification9 that a well is inactive, all production is exempt from severance tax shall be levied at10 the rate provided in this Paragraph for a period of five ten years from the date11 production begins or ninety days from the date of the application, whichever occurs12 first.13 * * *14 DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] Stuart Bishop HB No. 474 Abstract: Provide for a severance tax rate of 6.25% for ten years on oil produced from a well classified as inactive. Present law levies a severance tax of 12.5% on oil produced in the state. Provides for a 5- year exemption from such tax for oil produced from wells classified as inactive by the commissioner of conservation. Proposed law provides for a reduced rate of 6.25% for ten years on oil produced from wells classified as inactive. (Amends R.S. 47:633(7)(c)(iv) and (aa))