DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] Richard HB No. 73 Abstract: Requires a 10% reduction in the total dollar amount for professional, personal, and consulting service contracts under the jurisdiction of the office of contractual review for FY 2013-2014. Proposed law requires a 10% reduction in the total dollar amount for professional, personal, and consulting service contracts under the jurisdiction of the office of contractual review for FY 2013-2014. Proposed law requires the office of contractual review to submit reports on the status of the implementation of proposed law to the Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget on Oct. 1, 2013, Jan. 1, 2014, April 1, 2014, and July 1, 2014. Proposed law prohibits the office of contractual review from approving any contract if such approval would increase the total dollar amount of contracts above the reduction required in proposed law, unless such contract meets all of the following criteria: (1)Either no employee of the contracting department or agency is both competent and available to perform the services called for by the proposed contract or the services called for are not the type readily susceptible to being performed by persons who are employed by the state on a continuing basis. (2)The services are not available as a product of a prior or existing contract. (3)The contracting department or agency has submitted to the office of contractual review a written plan to monitor and evaluate the performance called for in the proposed contract. (4)It is more cost effective to obtain the proposed services through the contract than to have the services provided by the contracting department or agency if the department or agency can provide the services or by agreement with another state department or agency. (5)The commissioner of administration determines that the proposed contract represents a priority expenditure for La. state government. Present law provides for certain determinations by the director of the office of contractual review prior to the approval of proposed contracts. Proposed law retains present law and further provides that before approval, the director of the office of contractual review shall determine that a contract for professional, personal, or consulting services is not awarded to any entity for which an appropriation was enacted through a line item appropriation in the General Appropriations Act for the fiscal year in which the contract is proposed, and subsequently vetoed by the governor, for such amount or services as contained in the appropriation. Proposed law further provides that if the office of contractual review determines that a contract in the amount and for such services as were contained in the vetoed appropriation is proposed, the office shall not approve such contract without prior approval of the Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget. Effective July 1, 2013. (Adds R.S. 39:1493.11 and 1498(A)(10))