HLS 13RS-663 ENGROSSED Page 1 of 3 Regular Session, 2013 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON NO. 22 BY REPRESENTATIVE ST. GERMAIN NATURAL RESOURCES DEPT: Approves the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for FY 2013-2014 A CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON1 To approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan for Fiscal Year 2013-2014, as adopted2 by the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection3 and Restoration Authority.4 WHEREAS, R.S. 30:2000.1 et seq., provides for the creation, duties, and5 responsibilities of the Atchafalaya Basin Program, in the office of the secretary of the6 Department of Natural Resources, and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion7 Board; and8 WHEREAS, pursuant to R.S. 30:2000.11, a technical advisory group has been9 appointed to review, evaluate, and approve all water management and water quality projects10 proposed for inclusion in an annual plan to determine if the project meets the criteria for11 inclusion in the Annual Basin Plan, and make recommendations to the Atchafalaya Basin12 Research and Promotion Board; and13 WHEREAS, public participation in the development of the Annual Basin Plan is14 essential to the success of the Atchafalaya Basin Program; and15 WHEREAS, nominations for water quality projects were accepted from July 1, 2011,16 through June 30, 2012, at which time the technical advisory group reviewed and evaluated17 the water quality projects that were nominated by the public and selected projects for18 inclusion in the Annual Basin Plan as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(B); and19 WHEREAS, the Annual Basin Plan was then presented for public comment and20 discussion at meetings that were held on November 13, 2012, in Morgan City, Louisiana,21 HLS 13RS-663 ENGROSSED HCR NO. 22 Page 2 of 3 on November 14, 2012, in St. Martinville, Louisiana, and on November 15, 2012, in1 Plaquemine, Louisiana; and2 WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board at a public3 meeting held on November 29, 2012, in Baton Rouge, Louisiana, after receiving and4 considering the comments of the public, and the recommendations of the Atchafalaya Basin5 Program staff, unanimously approved the draft Annual Basin Plan; and6 WHEREAS, the Annual Basin Plan was submitted on January 22, 2013, to the7 Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority (CPRA) pursuant to R.S. 30:2000.11(E) for8 their review and approval as consistent with the master plan for coastal protection and9 restoration for a sustainable coast and was unanimously approved by CPRA at that meeting;10 and11 WHEREAS, at a public meeting held on February 6, 2013, the Atchafalaya Basin12 Research and Promotion Board, as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(D), considered and13 unanimously approved the proposed Annual Basin Plan; and14 WHEREAS, such committees must take action on the Atchafalaya Basin Annual15 Basin Plan, and the legislature may approve or disapprove the Annual Basin Plan by16 resolution adopted by a majority vote of the members of each house of the legislature; and17 WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan shall not be effective or18 implemented unless both houses of the legislature approve the annual plan or fail to19 disapprove the annual plan; and20 WHEREAS, the secretary shall implement the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan21 if the legislature approves the plan or if the legislature fails to timely disapprove of the plan.22 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby23 approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan for Fiscal Year 2013-2014, as presented24 by the secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and adopted by the Atchafalaya25 Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority.26 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the27 secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and28 Promotion Board.29 HLS 13RS-663 ENGROSSED HCR NO. 22 Page 3 of 3 DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] St. Germain HCR No. 22 Approves the FY 2013-2014 Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan.