Louisiana 2013 2013 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB203 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the
legislative instrument, were prepared by J. W. Wiley.
DIGEST
Proposed law provides for certain groundwater restrictions as follows:
(1)From August 1, 2013, to July 31, 2014, the commissioner must not authorize, issue or
re-issue any permit which allows the use or withdrawal of 40 million gallons or more of
groundwater per day.
(2)From August 1, 2014, to July 31, 2015, the commissioner must not authorize, issue or
re-issue any permit which allows the use or withdrawal of 35 million gallons or more of
groundwater per day.
(3)From August 1, 2015, to July 31, 2016, the commissioner must not authorize, issue or
re-issue any permit which allows the use or withdrawal of 30 million gallons or more of
groundwater per day.
(4)From August 1, 2016, to July 31, 2017, the commissioner must not authorize, issue or
re-issue any permit which allows the use or withdrawal of 25 million gallons or more of
groundwater per day.
(5)Beginning August 1, 2017, the commissioner must not authorize, issue or re-issue any
permit which allows the use or withdrawal of 20 million gallons or more of groundwater
per day.
Proposed law exempts agricultural or residential uses from proposed law.
Effective August 1, 2013.
(Amends R.S. 30:4(L) and R.S. 38:3097.3(F); adds R.S. 30:4(M) and R.S. 38:3097.3(G))