Louisiana 2013 2013 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB218 Engrossed / Bill

                    SLS 13RS-469	ENGROSSED
Page 1 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
Regular Session, 2013
SENATE BILL NO. 218
BY SENATOR MORRELL AND REPRESENTATI VE GIROD JACKSON 
Prefiled pursuant to Article III, Section 2(A)(4)(b)(i) of the Constitution of Louisiana.
ROADS/HIGHWAYS.  Prohibits DOTD from collecting fines from persons not paying tolls
on the Crescent City Connection. (gov sig)
AN ACT1
To enact R.S. 47:7013.1, relative to collection of tolls and fees; prohibits the Department of2
Transportation and Development from acting to collect tolls and certain fees and3
charges from any person who failed to pay a toll to cross the Crescent City4
Connection Bridge during a certain time period; and to provide for related matters.5
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:6
Section 1.  R.S. 47:7013.1 is hereby enacted to read as follows:7
ยง7013.1. Collection of tolls, fees, and charges on Crescent City Connection8
Bridge; prohibition9
Notwithstanding the provisions of R.S. 47:7012 and 7013, or any other10
law to the contrary, the Department of Transportation and Development shall11
not take any action to collect a toll, charge, administrative fee, or late charge12
from any person who failed to pay a toll to cross the Crescent City Connection13
Bridge, beginning on January 1, 2013, and continuing through May 4, 2013.14
Section 2. This Act shall become effective upon signature by the governor or, if not15
signed by the governor, upon expiration of the time for bills to become law without signature16
by the governor, as provided by Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Louisiana.  If17 SB NO. 218
SLS 13RS-469	ENGROSSED
Page 2 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
vetoed by the governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become1
effective on the day following such approval.2
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Sharon F. Lyles.
DIGEST
Morrell (SB 218)
Present law requires the DOTD to collect tolls to cross the Crescent City Connection Bridge
(CCC) beginning on January 1, 2013, until December 31, 2033, subject to a favorable vote
of certain electors.  On November 6, 2012, electors approved renewal of tolls.  On March
5, 2013, Hon. William Morvant, Judge, 19
th
 JDC, East Baton Rouge Parish, vacated the
election results which approved renewal of tolls on the CCC and ordered a new election to
be held on May 4, 2013.  DOTD suspended toll collections on March 5, 2013.
Proposed law prohibits DOTD from enforcing present law to collect a toll, charge,
administrative fee, or late charge required from any person for failure to pay a toll to cross
the CCC from January 1, 2013, through May 4, 2013.
Effective upon signature of the governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action.
(Adds R.S. 47:7013.1)