Page 1 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. Regular Session, 2013 ENROLLED SENATE BILL NO. 218 BY SENATOR MORRELL AND REPRESENTATI VE GIROD JACKSON Prefiled pursuant to Article III, Section 2(A)(4)(b)(i) of the Constitution of Louisiana. AN ACT1 To amend and reenact R.S. 48:1161.2(D) and to enact R.S. 47:7013.1, relative to collection2 of tolls and fees; prohibits the Department of Transportation and Development from3 acting to collect tolls and certain fees and charges from any person who failed to pay4 a toll to cross the Crescent City Connection Bridge during a certain time period; to5 require the Department of Transportation and Development to establish a toll6 violation amnesty program for certain persons who failed to pay a toll to cross the7 Crescent City Connection Bridge; to provide for terms and conditions of a toll8 amnesty program; to provide for the costs to implement a toll amnesty program; to9 require the Department of Transportation and Development to turn certain debt over10 to the Department of Justice or Department of Revenue for collections; and to11 provide for related matters.12 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:13 Section 1. R.S. 47:7013.1 is hereby enacted to read as follows:14 §7013.1. Collection of tolls, fees, and charges on Crescent City Connection15 Bridge; prohibition; amnesty program16 A. Notwithstanding the provisions of R.S. 47:7012 and 7013, or any17 other law to the contrary, the Department of Transportation and Development18 shall not take any action to collect a toll, charge, administrative fee, or late19 charge from any person who failed to pay a toll to cross the Crescent City20 Connection Bridge, beginning on January 1, 2013, and continuing through21 March 5, 2013.22 B. Notwithstanding any provision of law to the contrary, as of August23 1, 2013, notices of violations or delinquencies shall not be required to be sent to24 any person alleged to have failed to pay a toll to cross the Crescent City25 SB NO. 218 ENROLLED Page 2 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. Connection Bridge prior to January 1, 2013.1 C. (1) The department shall establish a toll violation amnesty program2 for all persons alleged to have failed to pay a toll to cross the Crescent City3 Connection Bridge prior to January 1, 2013.4 (2)(a) The department shall begin conducting the program no later than5 August 1, 2013, and shall conclude the program on October 1, 2013.6 (b) The department shall publicize the program in order to maximize the7 public awareness of and participation in the program.8 (3) During the program, the department shall not take any action to9 collect a charge, administrative fee, or late charge from a person who is alleged10 to have failed to pay a toll to cross the Crescent City Connection Bridge prior11 to January 1, 2013.12 (4)(a) Any person who has entered into a payment plan agreement in13 connection with an alleged failure to pay a toll to cross the Crescent City14 Connection Bridge prior to January 1, 2013, shall be entitled to avail themselves15 of the program.16 (b) Persons who avail themselves of the program shall be relieved of any17 further obligations pursuant to any payment plan agreement, and be obligated18 only to pay amounts due under the program.19 (c) The department may develop and implement procedures for applying20 payments made under payment plan agreements as credits against any amounts21 due under the program.22 (5) The department shall deposit all funds collected during the amnesty23 program into the Crescent City Transition Fund.24 (6) Upon conclusion of the program, the department shall do the25 following:26 (a) Notify the Department of Public Safety and Corrections, office of27 motor vehicles, of all persons who disposed of toll violations pursuant to the28 program. The office of motor vehicles shall be prohibited from refusing to29 renew the driver's licenses of any such persons for the alleged failure to respond30 SB NO. 218 ENROLLED Page 3 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. to a notice from the department pertaining to the alleged failure to pay a toll to1 cross the Crescent City Connection Bridge.2 (b) Submit all evidence of outstanding toll violations alleged to have3 occurred prior to January 1, 2013, to the Department of Justice or the4 Department of Revenue for collection.5 Section 2. R.S. 48:1161.2(D) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows:6 §1161.2. Crescent City Transition Fund7 * * *8 D. Monies in the fund shall be subject to appropriation by the legislature9 upon recommendation of the secretary of the Department of Transportation and10 Development. If the Department of Transportation and Development determines that11 an appropriation is necessary, the appropriated as follows: 12 (a) The first four million dollars of monies deposited in the fund shall be13 appropriated for use by the Department of Transportation and Development,14 hereinafter referred to as the "department", for the purpose of capitalizing ferry15 service formerly operated by the Crescent City Connection Division in the Marine16 Trust Program. One million four hundred thousand dollars of such funds17 available for such ferry service shall be appropriated and available for ferry18 operation costs, such funds to be appropriated annually in the amount of seven19 hundred thousand dollars for the fiscal years beginning July 1, 2013, and July20 1, 2014.21 (b) An amount not to exceed twenty percent of the funds collected and22 deposited into the fund pursuant to the toll violation amnesty program required23 to be established pursuant to R.S. 47:7013.1(B) shall be appropriated to the24 department for its costs incurred to implement the program.25 (c) Whether or not tolls are extended on the Crescent City Connection26 Bridge, the The balance of the monies in the fund as of December 31, 2012, shall be27 appropriated to the New Orleans Regional Planning Commission for lighting of the28 eastbank and westbank approaches to the Crescent City Connection Bridge including29 General DeGaulle and the Westbank Expressway approach through ground level,30 SB NO. 218 ENROLLED Page 4 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. improvements to ingress and egress points, lighting, maintenance, grass cutting, and1 landscaping of the westbank expressway Westbank Expressway and connecting2 arteries.3 * * *4 Section 3. This Act shall become effective upon signature by the governor or, if not5 signed by the governor, upon expiration of the time for bills to become law without signature6 by the governor, as provided by Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Louisiana. If7 vetoed by the governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become8 effective on the day following such approval.9 PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF LOUISIANA APPROVED: