Louisiana 2013 2013 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB218 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the
legislative instrument, were prepared by Sharon F. Lyles.
DIGEST
Morrell (SB 218)
Present law requires the DOTD to collect tolls to cross the Crescent City Connection Bridge
(CCC) beginning on January 1, 2013, until December 31, 2033, subject to a favorable vote of
certain electors.  On November 6, 2012, electors approved renewal of tolls.  On March 5, 2013,
Hon. William Morvant, Judge, 19
th
 JDC, East Baton Rouge Parish, vacated the election results
which approved renewal of tolls on the CCC and ordered a new election to be held on May 4,
2013.  DOTD suspended toll collections on March 5, 2013.
Proposed law prohibits DOTD from enforcing present law to collect a toll, charge, administrative
fee, or late charge required from any person for failure to pay a toll to cross the CCC from
January 1, 2013, through May 4, 2013.
Effective upon signature of the governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action.
(Adds R.S. 47:7013.1)