SLS 13RS-40 RE-REENGROSSED Page 1 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. Regular Session, 2013 SENATE BILL NO. 37 BY SENATORS GARY SMITH AND BROWN AND REPRESENTATI VE SCHEXNAYDER TAX/TAXATION. Authorizes for corporations a net operating loss carryback of 5 years if the loss is attributable to Hurricane Isaac. (see Act) AN ACT1 To amend and reenact R.S. 47:246(E) and 287.86(B)(1), relative to income tax; to authorize2 a net operating loss deduction carryback for corporations of five taxable years if the3 loss is attributable to Hurricane Isaac; and to provide for related matters.4 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:5 Section 1. R.S. 47:246(E) and 287.86(B)(1) are hereby amended and reenacted to6 read as follows:7 §246. Corporations; deduction from net income from Louisiana sources8 * * *9 E.(1)(a) At Except as provided for in Subparagraph (b) of this10 Paragraph, at the election of the taxpayer a net operating loss deduction as11 determined in Subsection B may be a net operating loss carry back carryback to12 each of the three taxable years preceding the taxable year of such loss.13 (b) Upon certification by the Department of Revenue, at the election of14 the taxpayer a net operating loss deduction as determined in Subsection B may15 be a net operating loss carryback to each of the five taxable years preceding the16 taxable year of such loss, if the allocable loss for the tax year is attributable to17 SB NO. 37 SLS 13RS-40 RE-REENGROSSED Page 2 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. Hurricane Isaac. The aggregate amount of net operating loss carryback1 deduction allowed under this Subparagraph for all taxpayers during any2 taxable year shall not exceed ten million dollars. An allocable loss is3 attributable to Hurricane Isaac if a portion of the allocable loss is attributable4 to business activity or business property of the taxpayer located in any parish5 which is in whole or in part in the area with respect to which a disaster has been6 declared by the president of the United States before September 10, 2012, under7 Section 401 of the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance8 Act by reason of Hurricane Isaac.9 (2) Such election shall be made in accordance with rules and regulations10 prescribed by the Secretary of the Department of Revenue and Taxation. The first11 period to which a net operating loss may be carried under this provision is taxable12 years beginning on or after January 1, 1980. 13 * * *14 §287.86. Net operating loss deduction15 * * *16 B. Net operating loss carrybacks and carryovers. The taxable years to which17 a Louisiana net loss may be carried shall be:18 (1)(a) A Except as provided for in Subparagraph(b) of this Paragraph,19 a net operating loss carryback to each of the three taxable years preceding the taxable20 year of such loss, unless carry back carryback treatment is relinquished pursuant to21 R.S. 47:287.86(D).22 (b) A net operating loss carryback to each of the five taxable years23 preceding the taxable year of such loss if such loss is attributable to Hurricane24 Isaac, unless carryback treatment is relinquished pursuant to R.S. 47:287.86(D).25 A net operating loss is attributable to Hurricane Isaac if a portion of the26 Louisiana net loss for the taxable year is attributable to business activity or27 business property of the taxpayer located in any parish which is in whole or in28 part in the area with respect to which a disaster has been declared by the29 SB NO. 37 SLS 13RS-40 RE-REENGROSSED Page 3 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. president of the United States before September 10, 2012, under Section 401 of1 the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act by reason2 of Hurricane Isaac.3 * * *4 Section 2. The provisions of this Act shall be applicable to all tax years beginning5 August 1, 2011, and thereafter.6 Section 3. The provisions of this Act shall become effective if, as, and when the7 113th Congress of the United States grants a similar benefit to taxpayers under federal8 income tax law. The secretary of the Department of Revenue shall provide written9 notification to the Louisiana State Law Institute if such a benefit is enacted.10 The original instrument was prepared by Riley Boudreaux. The following digest, which does not constitute a part of the legislative instrument, was prepared by Jerry G. Jones. DIGEST Gary Smith (SB 37) Present law authorizes a net operating loss carryback to each of the three taxable years preceding the taxable year of such loss. Proposed law authorizes, upon certification by the Department of Revenue, for corporations a net operating loss carryback of five years if the loss is "attributable to Hurricane Isaac". Provides that the aggregate amount of net operating loss carryback deduction allowed for all taxpayers during any taxable year shall not exceed ten million dollars. Proposed law provides that a loss is "attributable to Hurricane Isaac" if a portion of the Louisiana net loss for the taxable year is attributable to business activity or business property of the taxpayer located in any parish which is in whole or in part in the area with respect to which a disaster has been declared by the president of the United States before September 10, 2012, under Section 401 of the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act by reason of Hurricane Isaac. Applicable to all tax years beginning August 1, 2011, and thereafter. Effective if, as, and when the 113th Congress of the United States grants a similar benefit to taxpayers under federal income tax law. (Amends R.S. 47:246(E) and 287.86(B)(1)) Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate Committee Amendments Proposed by Senate Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs to the original bill 1. Removes provisions regarding other federal tax benefits and the federal income tax deduction. SB NO. 37 SLS 13RS-40 RE-REENGROSSED Page 4 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. Committee Amendments Proposed by Senate Committee on Finance to the engrossed bill 1. Effective date revised to become effective if, as, and when the 113th Congress of the United States grants a similar benefit to taxpayers under federal income tax law. Senate Floor Amendments to reengrossed bill 1. Adds upon certification by the Dept. of Revenue. 2. Adds that aggregate amount of net operating loss carryback deduction allowed for all taxpayers during any taxable year shall not exceed ten million dollars. 3. Changes tax year applicability from Jan. 1, 2012, and thereafter to Aug. 1, 2011, and thereafter. 4. Bureau.