Louisiana 2013 2013 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR128 Introduced / Bill

                    SLS 13RS-3283	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 3
Regular Session, 2013
SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON NO. 128
BY SENATORS GALLOT, KOSTELKA, LONG, RISER AND THOMPSON AND
REPRESENTATIVES SHADOIN AND JEFFERSON 
COMMENDATIONS.  Congratulates Terry and Rosy Bromell on their 50
th
 wedding
anniversary.
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON1
To commend and congratulate Terry and Rosy Bromell on their fiftieth wedding2
anniversary.3
WHEREAS, Terry Tyson Bromell saw Rose Marie Williams (Rosy) across the4
courtyard at Woodlawn High School and said to his friend, "That's the girl I'm going to5
marry."; and6
WHEREAS, Terry graduated from Woodlawn High School in 1962 and began his7
studies at Louisiana Tech University; and8
WHEREAS, true to his word, Terry and Rosy eloped and exchanged their wedding9
vows on June 14, 1963; however there was no honeymoon for them because Terry took Rosy10
back to her parents' farm in Keithville following the ceremony and they were able to hide11
their secret until…..; and12
WHEREAS, Rosy moved to Ruston to be with Terry and graduated from Ruston13
High School in 1964, and SHORTLY after her graduation, the couple welcomed their first14
child, Alicia Elline, on August 6, 1964; and15
WHEREAS, practically penniless students, Terry and Rosy were glad when Terry16
graduated from Louisiana Tech University in 1966 and became employed by Commercial17
Union Assurance Company, which was perfect timing since there was about to be another18 SCR NO. 128
SLS 13RS-3283	ORIGINAL
Page 2 of 3
mouth to feed and they welcomed their second daughter, Teena Teresa, on August 18, 1967;1
and2
WHEREAS, even with two children to care for, Rosy graduated from Louisiana Tech3
University in 1968 when she was VERY PREGNANT as she accepted her diploma, and4
Terry Tyson Bromell II (Ty) was born August 5, 1968; and5
WHEREAS, Rosy taught school for two years in Grambling until their last child,6
Rose Marie, was born on August 13, 1970; and7
WHEREAS, it is duly noted that Terry and Rosy must have really enjoyed the month8
of November since all their children were born in August; and9
WHEREAS, Terry was promoted within Commercial Union and, in April 1976, the10
family moved to Makati Manila, Philippines, where the family enjoyed four years of cultural11
experiences, still fondly referred to by family as "CE's"; and12
WHEREAS, the family moved back to Ruston in September of 1979 and Rosy13
obtained her real estate license in 1981 as Terry continued to work for Commercial Union14
until he started Bromell Agency in 1983; and15
WHEREAS, Terry and Rosy have been blessed with seven grandchildren: Ric16
Lowther, Jonah Doxey, Sarah Doxey, Erin Dillon, Ruth Dillon, Vivian Dillon, and Ellie17
Bromell; and18
WHEREAS, Terry and Rosy have navigated the good times and the bad and have19
succeeded in celebrating FIFTY years of wedded bliss despite working together for the past20
thirty years; and21
WHEREAS, Terry and Rosy Bromell are much loved and respected by their family22
and friends as they have spent their married life nurturing their children, grandchildren, and23
businesses and have served their community tirelessly.24
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana hereby25
commends and congratulates Terry and Rosy Bromell on their fiftieth wedding anniversary.26
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana extends best wishes27
to Terry and Rosy for continued happiness and blessings in their marriage.28
 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to Terry29
and Rosy Bromell.30 SCR NO. 128
SLS 13RS-3283	ORIGINAL
Page 3 of 3
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Jerry J. Guillot.
DIGEST
Gallot	SCR No. 128
Commends Terry and Rosy Bromell on their 50th wedding anniversary.