Louisiana 2013 2013 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR128 Enrolled / Bill

                    Page 1 of 2
Regular Session, 2013	ENROLLED
SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON NO. 128
BY SENATORS GALLOT, KOSTELKA, LONG, RISER AND THOMPSON AND
REPRESENTATIVES SHADOIN AND JEFFERSON 
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON
To commend and congratulate Terry and Rosy Bromell on their fiftieth wedding
anniversary.
WHEREAS, Terry Tyson Bromell saw Rose Marie Williams (Rosy) across the
courtyard at Woodlawn High School and said to his friend, "That's the girl I'm going to
marry."; and
WHEREAS, Terry graduated from Woodlawn High School in 1962 and began his
studies at Louisiana Tech University; and
WHEREAS, true to his word, Terry and Rosy eloped and exchanged their wedding
vows on June 14, 1963; however there was no honeymoon for them because Terry took Rosy
back to her parents' farm in Keithville following the ceremony and they were able to hide
their secret until…..; and
WHEREAS, Rosy moved to Ruston to be with Terry and graduated from Ruston
High School in 1964, and SHORTLY after her graduation, the couple welcomed their first
child, Alicia Elline, on August 6, 1964; and
WHEREAS, practically penniless students, Terry and Rosy were glad when Terry
graduated from Louisiana Tech University in 1966 and became employed by Commercial
Union Assurance Company, which was perfect timing since there was about to be another
mouth to feed and they welcomed their second daughter, Teena Teresa, on August 18, 1967;
and
WHEREAS, even with two children to care for, Rosy graduated from Louisiana Tech
University in 1968 when she was VERY PREGNANT as she accepted her diploma, and
Terry Tyson Bromell II (Ty) was born August 5, 1968; and
WHEREAS, Rosy taught school for two years in Grambling until their last child, SCR NO. 128	ENROLLED
Page 2 of 2
Rose Marie, was born on August 13, 1970; and
WHEREAS, it is duly noted that Terry and Rosy must have really enjoyed the month
of November since all their children were born in August; and
WHEREAS, Terry was promoted within Commercial Union and, in April 1976, the
family moved to Makati Manila, Philippines, where the family enjoyed four years of cultural
experiences, still fondly referred to by family as "CE's"; and
WHEREAS, the family moved back to Ruston in September of 1979 and Rosy
obtained her real estate license in 1981 as Terry continued to work for Commercial Union
until he started Bromell Agency in 1983; and
WHEREAS, Terry and Rosy have been blessed with seven grandchildren: Ric
Lowther, Jonah Doxey, Sarah Doxey, Erin Dillon, Ruth Dillon, Vivian Dillon, and Ellie
Bromell; and
WHEREAS, Terry and Rosy have navigated the good times and the bad and have
succeeded in celebrating FIFTY years of wedded bliss despite working together for the past
thirty years; and
WHEREAS, Terry and Rosy Bromell are much loved and respected by their family
and friends as they have spent their married life nurturing their children, grandchildren, and
businesses and have served their community tirelessly.
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana hereby
commends and congratulates Terry and Rosy Bromell on their fiftieth wedding anniversary.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana extends best wishes
to Terry and Rosy for continued happiness and blessings in their marriage.
 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to Terry
and Rosy Bromell.
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES