Louisiana 2013 2013 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR100 Introduced / Bill

                    SLS 13RS-1920	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 2
Regular Session, 2013
SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 100
BY SENATOR NEVERS 
COMMENDATIONS.  To recognize Fallen Heroes Memorial Day honoring Washington
Parish Sheriff's Office deputies killed in the line of duty.
A RESOLUTION1
To recognize Fallen Heroes Memorial Day honoring the seven Washington Parish Sheriff's2
Office deputies who made the ultimate sacrifice of giving their lives in the line of3
duty.4
WHEREAS, Washington Parish Sheriff Randy Seal has designated Wednesday, May5
15, 2013, as "Fallen Heroes Memorial Day" to honor the seven Washington Parish Sheriff's6
Office deputies who have been killed in the line of duty since 1899; and7
WHEREAS, on April 7, 1899, Sheriff Henry S. Burkhalter, at the age of 45, married8
with six children, was killed while in pursuit of murder suspects; and9
WHEREAS, on March 3, 1923, Deputy Sheriff Wiley Pierce, age 42, husband and10
father of six, and Deputy Sheriff Robert Wesley, age 35, husband and father of four, were11
killed while attempting to arrest two men for making moonshine; and12
WHEREAS, on July 21, 1934, Deputy Sheriff Delos C. Wood, age 61, married, was13
killed while attempting to arrest a suspect; and14
WHEREAS, on June 2, 1965, Deputy Sheriff Oneal Moore, age 34, husband, father15
of four daughters and the first African American deputy to serve in Washington Parish, was16
shot and killed by an unknown assailant in another vehicle who also seriously injured his17
partner, Deputy Creed Rogers; and18 SR NO. 100
SLS 13RS-1920	ORIGINAL
Page 2 of 2
WHEREAS, on September 20, 2005, Deputy Sheriff Jeffery Bickham, age 43,1
married with two daughters, was killed when pinned between his patrol car and another2
vehicle; and3
WHEREAS, on December 6, 2006, Deputy Sheriff Yvonne Pettit, mother of five4
children, was shot and killed; and 5
WHEREAS, all gave their lives while serving in the line of duty as law enforcement6
officers sworn to protect public safety and uphold the law; and 7
WHEREAS, their ultimate sacrifice for their community should be duly recognized8
and remembered; and 9
WHEREAS, the Scriptures remind us that "Greater love hath no man than this, that10
he lay down his life for his friends".11
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana12
does hereby commend the Sheriffs and Deputy Sheriffs of the Washington Parish Sheriff's13
Office for their continued devotion and service to the people of Washington Parish, and does14
hereby recognize Wednesday, May 15, 2013, as Fallen Heroes Memorial Day.15
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to16
Washington Parish Sheriff Randy Seal, and to each of the families of the deputy sheriffs who17
gave their lives in the service of Washington Parish.18
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Julie J. Baxter.
DIGEST
Nevers	SR No. 100
Recognizes Fallen Heroes Memorial Day honoring seven Washington Parish Sheriff's Office
deputies who, from 1899 through the present day, have made the ultimate sacrifice of giving
their lives in the line of duty.