Louisiana 2013 2013 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR116 Introduced / Bill

                    SLS 13RS-2223	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 2
Regular Session, 2013
SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 116
BY SENATOR NEVERS 
COMMENDATIONS.  Recognizes Fallen Heroes Memorial Day honoring Washington
Parish Sheriff's Office deputies killed in the line of duty.
A RESOLUTION1
To recognize Fallen Heroes Memorial Day honoring the eight Washington Parish Sheriff's2
Office deputies who made the ultimate sacrifice of giving their lives in the line of3
duty.4
WHEREAS, Washington Parish Sheriff Randy Seal has designated Wednesday, May5
15, 2013, as "Fallen Heroes Memorial Day" to honor the eight Washington Parish Sheriff's6
Office deputies who have been killed in the line of duty since 1899; and 7
WHEREAS, on April 7, 1899, Sheriff Henry S. Burkhalter at the age of 45, married8
with six children, was killed while in pursuit of murder suspects; and 9
WHEREAS, on March 3, 1923, Deputy Sheriff Wiley Pierce, age 42, husband and10
father of six, and Deputy Sheriff Robert Wesley Crain, age 35, husband and father of four,11
were killed while attempting to arrest two men for making moonshine; and 12
WHEREAS, on July 21, 1934, Deputy Sheriff Delos C. Wood, age 61, married, was13
killed while attempting to arrest a suspect; and 14
WHEREAS, on June 2, 1965, Deputy Sheriff Oneal Moore, age 34, husband, father15
of four daughters and the first African-American deputy to serve in Washington Parish, was16
shot and killed by an unknown assailant who also seriously injured his partner, Deputy17
Creed Rogers; and 18 SR NO. 116
SLS 13RS-2223	ORIGINAL
Page 2 of 2
WHEREAS, on September 20, 2005, Deputy Sheriff Jeffery Bickham, age 43,1
married with two daughters, was killed when pinned between his patrol car and another2
vehicle; and 3
WHEREAS, on December 6, 2006, Deputy Sheriff Yvonne Pettit, mother of five4
children, was shot and killed; and 5
WHEREAS, on March 1, 2010, Deputy Hilbert "Bill" Lewis, age 74, married with6
children, was killed by a drunk driver as the deputy was leaving the Washington Parish jail;7
and8
WHEREAS, all gave their lives while serving in the line of duty as law enforcement9
officers sworn to protect public safety and uphold the law; and 10
WHEREAS, their ultimate sacrifice for their community should be duly recognized11
and remembered; and12
WHEREAS, the Scriptures remind us that "Greater love hath no man than this, that13
he lay down his life for his friends". 14
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana15
does hereby commend the Sheriffs and Deputy Sheriffs of the Washington Parish Sheriff's16
Office for their continued devotion and service to the people of Washington Parish, and does17
hereby recognize Wednesday, May 15, 2013, as Fallen Heroes Memorial Day.18
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to19
Washington Parish Sheriff Randy Seal, and to each of the families of the deputy sheriffs who20
gave their lives in the service of Washington Parish.21
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Julie J. Baxter.
DIGEST
Nevers	SR No. 116
Recognizes Fallen Heroes Memorial Day honoring eight Washington Parish Sheriff's Office
deputies who, from 1899 through the present day, have made the ultimate sacrifice of giving
their lives in the line of duty.