Louisiana 2013 2013 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR116 Enrolled / Bill

                    Page 1 of 2
Regular Session, 2013	ENROLLED
SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 116
BY SENATOR NEVERS 
A RESOLUTION
To recognize Fallen Heroes Memorial Day honoring the eight Washington Parish Sheriff's
Office deputies who made the ultimate sacrifice of giving their lives in the line of
duty.
WHEREAS, Washington Parish Sheriff Randy Seal has designated Wednesday, May
15, 2013, as "Fallen Heroes Memorial Day" to honor the eight Washington Parish Sheriff's
Office deputies who have been killed in the line of duty since 1899; and 
WHEREAS, on April 7, 1899, Sheriff Henry S. Burkhalter at the age of 45, married
with six children, was killed while in pursuit of murder suspects; and 
WHEREAS, on March 3, 1923, Deputy Sheriff Wiley Pierce, age 42, husband and
father of six, and Deputy Sheriff Robert Wesley Crain, age 35, husband and father of four,
were killed while attempting to arrest two men for making moonshine; and 
WHEREAS, on July 21, 1934, Deputy Sheriff Delos C. Wood, age 61, married, was
killed while attempting to arrest a suspect; and 
WHEREAS, on June 2, 1965, Deputy Sheriff Oneal Moore, age 34, husband, father
of four daughters and the first African-American deputy to serve in Washington Parish, was
shot and killed by an unknown assailant who also seriously injured his partner, Deputy
Creed Rogers; and 
WHEREAS, on September 20, 2005, Deputy Sheriff Jeffery Bickham, age 43,
married with two daughters, was killed when pinned between his patrol car and another
vehicle; and 
WHEREAS, on December 6, 2006, Deputy Sheriff Yvonne Pettit, mother of five
children, was shot and killed; and 
WHEREAS, on March 1, 2010, Deputy Hilbert "Bill" Lewis, age 74, married with
children, was killed by a drunk driver as the deputy was leaving the Washington Parish jail;
and
WHEREAS, all gave their lives while serving in the line of duty as law enforcement
officers sworn to protect public safety and uphold the law; and  SR NO. 116	ENROLLED
Page 2 of 2
WHEREAS, their ultimate sacrifice for their community should be duly recognized
and remembered; and
WHEREAS, the Scriptures remind us that "Greater love hath no man than this, that
he lay down his life for his friends". 
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana
does hereby commend the Sheriffs and Deputy Sheriffs of the Washington Parish Sheriff's
Office for their continued devotion and service to the people of Washington Parish, and does
hereby recognize Wednesday, May 15, 2013, as Fallen Heroes Memorial Day.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to
Washington Parish Sheriff Randy Seal, and to each of the families of the deputy sheriffs who
gave their lives in the service of Washington Parish.
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE