Louisiana 2013 2013 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR151 Introduced / Bill

                    SLS 13RS-3026	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 2
Regular Session, 2013
SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 151
BY SENATOR MURRAY 
INTERNATIONAL AFFAIRS. Expresses support for the Nagorno Karabakh Republic's
efforts to develop as a free and independent nation.
A RESOLUTION1
To express support for the Nagorno Karabakh Republic's efforts to develop as a free and2
independent nation.3
WHEREAS, Nagorno Karabakh, also known as Artsakh, has historically been4
Armenian territory, populated by an overwhelming majority of Armenians, which was5
illegally severed from Armenia by the Soviet Union in 1921 and placed under the newly6
created Soviet Azerbaijani administration; and7
WHEREAS, February 20, 1988, marked the beginning of the national liberation8
movement in Nagorno Karabakh, which inspired people throughout the Soviet Union to9
stand up against tyranny and for their rights and freedoms, helping to bring democracy to10
millions and contributing to world peace; and11
WHEREAS, the United States Senate Congress has repeatedly expressed support for12
the legitimate freedom aspirations of the people of Nagorno Karabakh; and13
WHEREAS, on September 2, 1991, the legislature of Nagorno Karabakh declared14
formation of the Nagorno Karabakh Republic, in accordance with then acting legislation;15
and16
WHEREAS, on December 10, 1991, the people of the Nagorno Karabakh Republic17
voted in favor of the independence, and on January 6, 1992, the democratically elected18 SR NO. 151
SLS 13RS-3026	ORIGINAL
Page 2 of 2
legislature of the Republic formally declared independence; and1
WHEREAS, since proclaiming independence, the Nagorno Karabakh Republic has2
registered significant progress in democracy building, which has been most recently3
demonstrated during the July 19, 2012, Presidential elections that were assessed by4
international observers as free and transparent.5
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana6
hereby encourages and supports the Nagorno Karabakh Republic's continuing efforts to7
develop as a free and independent nation in order to guarantee its citizens those rights8
inherent in a free and independent society.9
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the President and Congress of the United States10
of America are hereby urged to support the self-determination and democratic independence11
of the Nagorno Karabakh Republic and its constructive involvement with the international12
community's efforts to reach a just and lasting solution to security issues in that strategically13
important region.14
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the15
President of the United States, the secretary of the United States Senate, the clerk of the16
United States House of Representatives, and to each member of the Louisiana delegation to17
the United States Congress.18
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Jerry J. Guillot.
DIGEST
Murray	SR No. 151
Encourages and supports the Nagorno Karabakh Republic's continuing efforts to develop as
a free and independent nation in order to guarantee its citizens those rights inherent in a free
and independent society.
Urges the U.S. President and Congress to support the self-determination and democratic
independence of the Nagorno Karabakh Republic and its constructive involvement with the
international community's efforts to reach a just and lasting solution to security issues in that
strategically important region.