SLS 13RS-1544 ORIGINAL Page 1 of 3 Regular Session, 2013 SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 82 BY SENATOR AMEDEE COMMENDATIONS. Recognizes and commends the accomplishments of the staff of the Louisiana Workforce Commission Employment Security Board of Review. A RESOLUTION1 To recognize and commend the accomplishments of the staff of the Louisiana Workforce2 Commission Employment Security Board of Review.3 WHEREAS, the Louisiana Workforce Commission Employment Security Board of4 Review, through its staff, in just under two years, has made substantial and notable5 improvements in its handling of appeals; and6 WHEREAS, in January 2011, the board had 1,688 pending appeals, but only7 disposed of 8%, or 204 of those appeals with the average age of the 1,688 pending cases8 being 107 days; and9 WHEREAS, to address its backlog, the board hired a new administrator, Dayne10 Freeman, and employed licensed attorneys to assist the appointed board members with case11 review, and by July 2011, the end of Mrs. Freeman's tenure, the board had rendered 3,63412 decisions and reduced its pending appeals to 890 and average case age to 58 days; and13 WHEREAS, on July 18, 2011, Shaydra Guillory became new administrator of the14 board and under her leadership, the board made further reduction to the time required to15 handle appeals in that by the end of July 2012, the board had reduced its pending appeals to16 200 with the average age of the pending appeals being 15 days; and17 WHEREAS, in August 2012, Renita Ward-Williams was hired as administrator of18 SR NO. 82 SLS 13RS-1544 ORIGINAL Page 2 of 3 the board and as of January 2013, the board had reduced its month end pending appeals to1 49, with the remarkably reduced average age of its pending cases from 107 days in 2011 to2 being between three (3) to five (5) days with the board having made 9,478 legal decisions3 in the two year period; and4 WHEREAS, according to United States Department of Labor reports, the board has5 achieved the following recent accomplishments:6 September 2012 - Best in the country for higher appeals authority case aging;7 average case age was 5 days.8 October 2012 - Best in the country for higher appeals authority case aging, average9 case age was 3 days.10 November 2012 - Best in the country for higher appeals authority case aging;11 average case age was 4 days.12 December 2012 - Best in the country for higher appeals authority case aging;13 average case age was 4 days.14 January 2013 - Ranked 2nd in the country for higher appeals authority case aging;15 average case age was 3 days.16 February 2013 - Best in the country for higher appeals authority case aging; average17 case age was 4 days; and18 WHEREAS, these accomplishments have occurred due to the tremendous dedication19 and effort of the staff of the Board of Review, particularly Renita Ward-Williams,20 Administrative Law Judge-Advanced/Supervisor; Marilyn Grimes, Administrative Law21 Judge; Madeline Carbonette, Administrative Law Judge; Tiffany Christensen,22 Administrative Law Judge; Nicole Williams, Clerical Staff; Angela Lawson, Clerical Staff;23 and Pamela Cannon, Clerical Staff; and24 WHEREAS, these accomplishments were also the product of the outstanding25 leadership of the three administrators, namely Dayne Freeman, current Office of26 Unemployment Insurance Director; Shaydra Guillory, current Chief of Appeals, and Renita27 Ward-Williams.28 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana29 hereby recognizes and commends the outstanding and dedicated service and remarkable30 SR NO. 82 SLS 13RS-1544 ORIGINAL Page 3 of 3 accomplishments of the staff of the Louisiana Workforce Commission Employment Security1 Board of Review.2 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that copies of this Resolution be transmitted to3 Dayne Freeman, Shaydra Guillory, Renita Ward-Williams, Marilyn Grimes, Madeline4 Carbonette, Tiffany Christensen, Nicole Williams, Angela Lawson, and Pamela Cannon.5 The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Jerry J. Guillot. DIGEST Amedee SR No. 82 Commends the outstanding and dedicated service and remarkable accomplishments of the staff of the La. Workforce Commission Employment Security Board of Review.