Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB1272 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 14RS-3389	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 2
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Regular Session, 2014
HOUSE BILL NO. 1272         (Substitute for House Bill No. 515 by Representative Henry)
BY REPRESENTATIVE HENRY
APPROPRIATIONS/JUDGMENT:  Appropriates funds for judgments against the state
related to expropriation of property in the matter of "Board of Supervisors of
Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College v. 1732 Canal
Street, LLC, et al"
AN ACT1
To provide for the payment and satisfaction out of the moneys appropriated and allocated2
to the LSU Health Sciences Center Health Care Services for the University Medical3
Center (Orleans) project in House Bill No. 2 of the 2014 Regular Legislative Session4
and previous capital outlay Acts to be used to pay and satisfy the judgments for just5
compensation related to the expropriation of property in accordance with Article I,6
Section 4 of the Louisiana Constitution of 1974, in the suit entitled "Board of7
Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College8
v. 1732 Canal Street, LLC, et al"; to provide for costs; to provide for attorney fees;9
to provide for interest; and to provide for related matters.  10
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:11
Section 1. The sum of Five Million Sixty-Six Thousand Six Hundred Forty and12
No/100 ($5,066,640.00) Dollars (awarded in the judgment dated May 10, 2012), plus interest13
from October 18, 2010 until paid, plus costs in the amount of Three Hundred Thousand14
Twenty-Four and 23/100 ($300,024.23) Dollars (awarded in the judgment dated April 29,15
2013), plus interest from April 29, 2013, plus attorney fees of eighteen percent (18%) of the16
additional just compensation plus interest awarded in the judgment dated May 10, 2012; plus17
additional costs and attorney fees for post-trial work in the amount of One Hundred Thirty-18
Five Thousand and No/100 ($135,000.00) Dollars (awarded in the judgment dated April 2,19 HLS 14RS-3389	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 1272
Page 2 of 2
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
2014); said interest amounts to be calculated pursuant to R.S. 19:155; are hereby1
appropriated, allocated or otherwise made available out of the moneys appropriated and2
allocated to the LSU Health Sciences Center Health Care Services for the University3
Medical Center (Orleans) project (the "project") in House Bill No. 2 of the 2014 Regular4
Legislative Session for Fiscal Year 2014-2015 or previous Acts of the Legislature, to be used5
to pay and satisfy the judgments related to the expropriation of property related to said6
project and in accordance with Article I, Section 4 of the Louisiana Constitution of 1974, in7
the suit entitled "Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and8
Mechanical College v. 1732 Canal Street, LLC, et al", bearing Number 10-10488, Section9
"8", Division "N", on the docket of the Civil District Court, parish of Orleans, state of10
Louisiana and No. 2012-CA-1370 on the docket of the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeal, state11
of Louisiana.12
Section 2. The judgments provided for in Section 1 hereof shall be deemed to have13
been paid on the effective date of this Act and legal interest shall cease to run as of that date.14
Section 3. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2014; if vetoed by the governor15
and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on July 1,16
2014, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.17
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Henry	HB No. 1272
Provides for the payment and satisfaction out of the moneys appropriated and allocated to
the LSU Health Sciences Center Health Care Services for the University Medical Center
(Orleans) project in HB No. 2 of the 2014 Regular Session for FY 2014-2015 and previous
capital outlay Acts, the sum of $5,066,640 (May 10, 2012 judgment), plus interest from Oct.
18, 2010 until paid, plus costs in the amount of $300,024.23 (April 29, 2013 judgment), plus
interest from April 29, 2013, plus attorney fees of 18% of the additional just compensation
plus interest awarded in judgment dated May 10, 2012; plus additional costs and attorney
fees in the amount of $135,000 (April 2, 2014 judgment), to pay the judgments related to
expropriation of property in accordance with Art. I, Sec. 4 of the La. Constitution of 1974,
in the suit entitled "Bd. of Supervisors of LSU A&M College v. 1732 Canal St., LLC, et al",
bearing No. 10-10488, Sec. "8", Div. "N", on the docket of the Civil District Court, parish
of Orleans, state of La. and No. 2012-CA-1370 on the docket of the 4
th
 Circuit Court of
Appeal, state of La.
Effective July 1, 2014.