Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB1272 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part of
the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of
the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Henry	HB No. 1272
Provides for the payment and satisfaction out of the moneys appropriated and allocated to the
LSU Health Sciences Center Health Care Services for the University Medical Center (Orleans)
project in HB No. 2 of the 2014 Regular Session for FY 2014-2015 and previous capital outlay
Acts, the sum of $5,066,640 (May 10, 2012 judgment), plus interest  from Oct. 18, 2010 until
paid, plus costs in the amount of $300,024.23 (April 29, 2013 judgment), plus interest from April
29, 2013, plus attorney fees of 18% of the additional just compensation plus interest awarded in
judgment dated May 10, 2012; plus additional costs and attorney fees in the amount of $135,000
(April 2, 2014 judgment), to pay the judgments related to expropriation of property in accordance
with Art. I, Sec. 4 of the La. Constitution of 1974, in the suit entitled "Bd. of Supervisors of LSU
A&M College v. 1732 Canal St., LLC, et al", bearing No. 10-10488, Sec. "8", Div. "N", on the
docket of the Civil District Court, parish of Orleans, state of La. and No. 2012-CA-1370 on the
docket of the 4
th
 Circuit Court of Appeal, state of La.
Effective July 1, 2014.