Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB195 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 14RS-382	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 2
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Regular Session, 2014
HOUSE BILL NO. 195
BY REPRESENTATIVE SIMON
SUNSET LAW:  Re-creates the Department of Children and Family Services
AN ACT1
To enact R.S. 49:191(7)(a) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(5)(g), relative to the Department of2
Children and Family Services, including provisions to provide for the re-creation of3
the Department of Children and Family Services and the statutory entities made a4
part of the department by law; to provide for the effective termination date for all5
statutory authority for the existence of such statutory entities; and to provide for6
related matters.7
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:8
Section 1. Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of Children and Family Services9
and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective10
June 30, 2014, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with the11
provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.12
Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of Children and13
Family Services and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created by14
Section 1 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2019, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However, the15
Department of Children and Family Services may be re-created prior to such date in16
accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised17
Statutes of 1950.18
Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that19
those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.20
Section 4.  R.S. 49:191(7)(a) is hereby enacted to read as follows:21 HLS 14RS-382	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 195
Page 2 of 2
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase-1
out period for statutory entities; table of dates2
Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the3
legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their4
operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority5
for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of6
July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:7
*          *          *8
(7)  July 1, 2018:9
(a) The Department of Children and Family Services and all statutory entities10
made a part of the department by law.11
Section 5.  R.S. 49:191(5)(g) is hereby repealed in its entirety.12
Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2014; if vetoed by the13
governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on14
June 30, 2014, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.15
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Simon	HB No. 195
Abstract: Re-creates the Dept. of Children and Family Services.
Present law (Sunset) provides that the Dept. of Children and Family Services and all the
statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their
operations on July 1, 2014, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as
of July 1, 2015, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the
department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Children and Family
Services and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the "sunset"
law.  Proposed law supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure
for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity
within the department along with additional provisions. Proposed law makes July 1, 2019,
the new termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2018, unless the department
is re-created again.
Effective June 30, 2014.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(7)(a); Repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(g))