HLS 14RS-371 ORIGINAL Page 1 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. Regular Session, 2014 HOUSE BILL NO. 232 BY REPRESENTATIVE PONTI SUNSET LAW: Re-creates certain entities transferred to or placed within the office of the governor AN ACT1 To enact R.S. 49:191(7)(a) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(5)(l), relative to certain agencies2 within the office of the governor, including provisions to provide for the re-creation3 of such agencies; to provide for the effective termination date for all statutory4 authority for the existence of such statutory entities; and to provide for related5 matters.6 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:7 Section 1. Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the agencies transferred to the office of the8 governor pursuant to R.S. 36:4.1, to wit: the Louisiana State Board of Cosmetology, the9 Office of Financial Institutions, the Louisiana State Racing Commission, the Louisiana10 Cemetery Board, the State Board of Certified Public Accountants of Louisiana, the State11 Board of Architectural Examiners, the Louisiana Real Estate Commission, the Louisiana12 State Board of Home Inspectors, the State Licensing Board for Contractors, the Board of13 Examiners of Certified Shorthand Reporters, the Louisiana Auctioneers Licensing Board,14 the State Board of Examiners of Interior Designers, the Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers15 Board, the State Boxing and Wrestling Commission, the Louisiana Motor Vehicle16 Commission, the Louisiana Used Motor Vehicle Commission, and the Louisiana State17 Polygraph Board shall be re-created effective June 30, 2014, and all statutory authority18 therefor is continued in accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 4919 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.20 HLS 14RS-371 ORIGINAL HB NO. 232 Page 2 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the aforementioned agencies1 and the statutory entities made a part of them as re-created by Section 1 of this Act shall2 cease as of July 1, 2019, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However, the aforementioned agencies3 may be re-created prior to such date in accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter4 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.5 Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that6 those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.7 Section 4. R.S. 49:191(7)(a) is hereby enacted to read as follows: 8 ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase-9 out period for statutory entities; table of dates10 Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the11 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their12 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority13 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of14 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:15 * * *16 (7) July 1, 2018:17 (a) Those entities transferred to or placed within the office of the governor18 pursuant to R.S. 36:4.1.19 Section 5. R.S. 49:191(5)(l) is hereby repealed in its entirety.20 Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2014; if vetoed by the21 governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on22 June 30, 2014, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.23 HLS 14RS-371 ORIGINAL HB NO. 232 Page 3 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] Ponti HB No. 232 Abstract: Re-creates various agencies within the office of the governor. Present law requires, under the "sunset" law, that the following agencies shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2014: (1)La. State Board of Cosmetology. (2)Office of Financial Institutions. (3)La. State Racing Commission. (4)La. Cemetery Board. (5)State Board of Certified Public Accountants of La. (6)State Board of Architectural Examiners. (7)La. Real Estate Commission. (8)La. State Board of Home Inspectors. (9)State Licensing Board for Contractors. (10)Board of Examiners of Certified Shorthand Reporters. (11)La. Auctioneers Licensing Board. (12)State Board of Examiners of Interior Designers. (13)La. Real Estate Appraisers Board. (14)State Boxing and Wrestling Commission. (15)La. Motor Vehicle Commission. (16)La. Used Motor Vehicle Commission. (17)La. State Polygraph Board. Present law provides that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2015, unless legislation is enacted which authorizes the re-creation of those entities prior thereto. Proposed law provides for re-creation of those agencies, effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the "sunset" law. Supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which sets out the procedure for review and re-creation and which requires a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within those agencies along with additional provisions. July 1, 2019, HLS 14RS-371 ORIGINAL HB NO. 232 Page 4 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. is the new termination date, and termination will begin July 1, 2018, unless the agency is again re-created. Effective June 30, 2014. (Adds R.S. 49:191(7)(a); Repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(l))