Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB314 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 14RS-1065	ENGROSSED
Page 1 of 2
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Regular Session, 2014
HOUSE BILL NO. 314
BY REPRESENTATIVE ARNOLD
SUNSET LAW:  Re-creates the Dept. of Justice
AN ACT1
To enact R.S. 49:191(7)(a) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(5)(m), relative to the Department of2
Justice, including provisions to provide for the re-creation of the Department of3
Justice and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law; to provide for4
the effective termination date for all statutory authority for the existence of such5
statutory entities; and to provide for related matters.6
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:7
Section 1. Pursuant to R.S. 40:193, the Department of Justice and the statutory8
entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective June 30, 2014, and9
all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with the provisions of Part XII of10
Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.11
Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of Justice and12
the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created by Section 1 of this Act13
shall cease as of July 1, 2019, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However, the Department of Justice14
may be re-created prior to such date in accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter15
1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.16
Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that17
those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.18
Section 4.  R.S. 49:191(7)(a) is hereby enacted to read as follows: 19 HLS 14RS-1065	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 314
Page 2 of 2
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase-1
out period for statutory entities; table of dates2
Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the3
legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their4
operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority5
for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of6
July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:7
*          *          *8
(7)  July 1, 2018:9
(a) The Department of Justice and all statutory entities made a part of the10
department by law.11
Section 5.  R.S. 49:191(5)(m) is hereby repealed in its entirety.12
Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2014; if vetoed by the13
governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on14
June 30, 2014, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.15
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Arnold	HB No. 314
Abstract: Re-creates the Dept. of Justice. 
Present law (Sunset) provides that the Dept. of Justice and all the statutory entities made a
part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2014, and
that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2015, unless the
legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities
prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Justice and its statutory
entities, effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the "sunset law".  Proposed law
supersedes the provisions of the "sunset law" which set out the procedure for review and re-
creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity with the
department along with additional provisions.  Proposed law makes July 1, 2019, the new
termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2018, unless the department is re-
created again.
Effective June 30, 2014.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(7)(a); Repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(m))