Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB314 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part of
the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of
the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Arnold	HB No. 314
Abstract: Re-creates the Dept. of Justice. 
Present law (Sunset) provides that the Dept. of Justice and all the statutory entities made a part of
that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2014, and that all
legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2015, unless the legislature enacts a
bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Justice and its statutory entities,
effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the "sunset law".  Proposed law supersedes the
provisions of the "sunset law" which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which
require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity with the department along with additional
provisions.  Proposed law makes July 1, 2019, the new termination date and termination would
begin July 1, 2018, unless the department is re-created again.
Effective June 30, 2014.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(7)(a); Repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(m))