Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB314 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Arnold (HB 314)	Act No. 159
Prior law (Sunset) provided that the Dept. of Justice and all the statutory entities made a part
of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2014, and that
all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2015, unless the legislature
enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior
thereto.
New law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Justice and its statutory entities,
effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the "sunset law".  New law supersedes the
provisions of the "sunset law" which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and
which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity with the department along with
additional provisions.  New law makes July 1, 2019, the new termination date and
termination would begin July 1, 2018, unless the department is re-created again.
Effective June 30, 2014.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(7)(a); Repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(m))