DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] Richard HB No. 391 Abstract: Pursuant to HCR No. 218 of the 2009 R.S. (which requested the La. State Law Institute to study and propose a revised codification of Title 33 of the La. Revised Statutes of 1950), directs the La. State Law Institute to redesignate provisions for the Law Enforcement Executive Management Institute from Title 33 to Title 40 and transfers the institute from the governor's office to the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections. Present law (R.S. 33:2341 et seq.) creates the Law Enforcement Executive Management Institute and its board in the office of the governor. Provides for board membership, for staggered two- year terms, and for officers and meetings. Provides that members serve without compensation. Provides that the institute, by and through the board, serves as the coordinator for the training of chiefs of police in Louisiana (does not apply to the superintendent of the La. State Police, sheriffs, and constables.) Requires the institute, by and through the board, to: (1)Establish a new chief of police development course prior to Dec. 31, 2011. (2)Establish a chief of police continuing education program prior to Dec. 31, 2011. (3) Establish requirements for approval and accreditation of other training and continuing education programs sponsored or offered by the federal government, other states, and agencies outside the jurisdiction of the institute. (4)Cooperate with municipal, parish, special district, state, and federal law enforcement agencies in training programs. (5)Conduct research to improve law enforcement and police administration and stimulate research by public and private agencies for that purpose. (6)Accept donations, contributions, grants, or gifts from individuals, foundations, state or federal government. (7)Contract with other persons as the board deems necessary for services, facilities, studies, or training. Present law (subject to appropriation of sufficient funds by the legislature) requires that each municipal chief of police (except a chief elected or appointed prior to Jan. 1, 2004) successfully complete the New Chief Management Course not later than one year after election or appointment. Requires each municipal chief of police (except a chief with continuous service from Jan. 1, 1983) to complete 24 hours of continuing education as approved by the board within every 24-month period. Provides that failure to comply with these requirements will result in forfeiture of supplemental pay benefits. Specifies that these requirements also apply to every nonmunicipal chief of police elected or appointed to the position as chief on or after Jan. 1, 2012. (Nonmunicipal chief of police includes any chief of police of a board, authority, commission, department, office, division, or agency of the state or any of its political subdivisions, but not the chief of police of a municipal police department.) Provisions do not apply to the superintendent of the La. State Police, sheriffs, and constables. Proposed law, retains present law, except transfers the institute and its board from the office of the governor to the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections. Specifies that the institute and the board are executive branch agencies. Proposed law also directs the La. State Law Institute to redesignate present law from Title 33 of the La. Revised Statutes of 1950 (Municipalities and Parishes) to Title 40 of the La. Revised Statutes (Public Health and Safety). Effective Nov. 1, 2014, except provisions for redesignation of statutes are effective upon signature of the governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action. (Amends R.S. 33:2342(A); Adds R.S. 36:409(S); Repeals R.S. 36:4(B)(1)(s)) (Provides for redesignation of Subpart F of Part III of Chapter 4 of Title 33 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950, R.S. 33:2341-2345 to Chapter 18-A of Title 40 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950, R.S. 40:2411-2415)