HLS 14RS-383 ORIGINAL Page 1 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. Regular Session, 2014 HOUSE BILL NO. 40 BY REPRESENTATIVE PEARSON RETIREME NT/STATE EMPS: Provides for application of remaining funds in the La. State Employees' Retirement System experience account, after payment of a permanent benefit increase to eligible retirees and beneficiaries, to specified debt of the system AN ACT1 To enact R.S. 11:102.1(B)(6), relative to liabilities of the Louisiana State Employees'2 Retirement System; to provide for application of funds from certain accounts to3 certain such liabilities; to provide restrictions relative to the financing of such debt;4 to provide an effective date; and to provide for related matters.5 Notice of intention to introduce this Act has been published6 as provided by Article X, Section 29(C) of the Constitution7 of Louisiana.8 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:9 Section 1. R.S. 11:102.1(B)(6) is hereby enacted to read as follows: 10 ยง102.1. Consolidation of amortization payment schedules; Louisiana State11 Employees' Retirement System12 * * *13 B.14 * * *15 (6) Effective for the June 30, 2014, valuation, to this base shall be applied16 any funds remaining in the experience account from the July 1, 2013, account17 HLS 14RS-383 ORIGINAL HB NO. 40 Page 2 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. balance after payment of a permanent benefit increase pursuant to the provisions of1 R.S. 11:542, without reamortization of the base.2 * * *3 Section 2. This Act shall become effective on June 27, 2014; if vetoed by the4 governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on5 June 27, 2014, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.6 DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] Pearson HB No. 40 Abstract: Provides for application of remaining experience account funds to the initial unfunded accrued liability (IUAL) of the La. State Employees' Retirement System (LASERS), after the system pays a permanent benefit increase to eligible retirees and beneficiaries pursuant to present law. Present law (R.S. 11:542) provides for LASERS system funds to be deposited into the experience account at the end of each fiscal year if the system attains certain funding targets. Present law authorizes a permanent benefit increase to be granted to certain retirees and beneficiaries of LASERS if there is sufficient money in the experience account. Authorizes such an increase at the rate of the lesser of: (1)3%. (2)The CPI-U for the last year. The CPI-U, as calculated by the U.S. Dept. of Labor, Bureau of Labor Statistics, for the last year was 1.5%. Present law (R.S. 11:102.1) provides for the Original Amortization Base (OAB) and the Experience Account Amortization Base (EAAB) for debts of LASERS. Generally, the OAB is the consolidated amortization base for the initial unfunded accrued liability of the system that existed as of June 30, 1988. Generally, the EAAB is the consolidated amortization base for the actuarial losses of the system between 1988 and 2009. Proposed law retains present law. Proposed law applies to the LASERS OAB any remaining funds in the LASERS experience account after payment of a permanent benefit increase to eligible retirees and beneficiaries effective July 1, 2014. Proposed law prohibits reamortization of the OAB after application of funds pursuant to proposed law. Effective June 27, 2014. (Adds R.S. 11:102.1(B)(6))