Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB404 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part of
the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of
the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Henry Burns	HB No. 404
Abstract: Re-creates the Dept. of Veterans Affairs.
Present law (Sunset) provides that the Dept. of Veterans Affairs and all the statutory entities
made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2014,
and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2015, unless the
legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities
prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Veterans Affairs and its
statutory entities, effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the "sunset law".  Proposed law
supersedes the provisions of the "sunset law" which set out the procedure for review and re-
creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity with the department
along with additional provisions.  Proposed law makes July 1, 2019, the new termination date
and termination would begin July 1, 2018, unless the department is re-created again.
Effective June 30, 2014.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(7)(a); Repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(j))