DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] Henry Burns HB No. 404 Abstract: Re-creates the Dept. of Veterans Affairs. Present law (Sunset) provides that the Dept. of Veterans Affairs and all the statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2014, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2015, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Veterans Affairs and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the "sunset law". Proposed law supersedes the provisions of the "sunset law" which set out the procedure for review and re- creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity with the department along with additional provisions. Proposed law makes July 1, 2019, the new termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2018, unless the department is re-created again. Effective June 30, 2014. (Adds R.S. 49:191(7)(a); Repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(j))