Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB404 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Henry Burns (HB 404)	Act No. 621
Prior law (Sunset) provided that the Dept. of Veterans Affairs and all the statutory entities
made a part of that department by law would terminate their operations on July 1, 2014, and
that all legislative authority for such entities would cease as of July 1, 2015, unless the
legislature enacted a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory
entities prior thereto.
New law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Veterans Affairs and its
statutory entities, effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the "sunset law".  New law
supersedes the provisions of the "sunset law" which set out the procedure for review and re-
creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity with the
department along with additional provisions.  New law makes July 1, 2019, the new
termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2018, unless the department is re-
created again.
Effective June 30, 2014.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(7)(a); Repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(j))