Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB515 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 14RS-1082	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 2
Regular Session, 2014
HOUSE BILL NO. 515
BY REPRESENTATIVE HENRY
APPROPRIATIONS/JUDGMENT:  Appropriates funds for judgment against the state in the
matter of "Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and
Mechanical College v. 1732 Canal Street, LLC, et al"
AN ACT1
To appropriate funds out of the General Fund of the state of Louisiana for Fiscal Year 2014-2
2015 to be used to pay the judgments in the suit entitled "Board of Supervisors of3
Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College v. 1732 Canal4
Street, LLC, et al"; to provide for interest; to provide for court costs; and to provide5
for related matters.6
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:7
Section 1. The sum of Five Million Sixty-Six Thousand Six Hundred Forty and8
No/100 ($5,066,640.00) Dollars (awarded in the judgment dated May 10, 2012), plus interest9
from October 18, 2010 until paid, plus costs in the amount of Three Hundred Thousand10
Twenty-Four and 23/100 ($300,024.23) Dollars (awarded in the judgment dated April 29,11
2013), plus interest from April 29, 2013, plus attorneys fees of eighteen percent (18%) of12
the additional just compensation plus interest awarded in the judgment dated May 10, 2012;13
said interest amounts to be calculated pursuant to R.S. 19:155; are hereby appropriated out14
of the General Fund of the state of Louisiana for Fiscal Year 2014-2015 to be used to pay15
the judgments in the suit entitled "Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and16
Agricultural and Mechanical College v. 1732 Canal Street, LLC, et al", bearing Number 10-17
10488, Section "8", Division "N", on the docket of the Civil District Court, parish of18
Orleans, state of Louisiana and No. 2012-CA-1370 on the docket of the Fourth Circuit Court19
of Appeal, state of Louisiana.20 HLS 14RS-1082	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 515
Page 2 of 2
Section 2.  The judgment provided for in Section 1 hereof shall be deemed to have1
been paid on the effective date of this Act and legal interest shall cease to run as of that date.2
Section 3. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2014; if vetoed by the governor3
and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on July 1,4
2014, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.5
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Henry	HB No. 515
Appropriates from the state general fund for FY 2014-2015 the sum of $5,066,640,
(awarded in the judgment dated May 10, 2012), plus interest from Oct. 18, 2010 until paid,
plus costs in the amount of $300,024.23 (awarded in the judgment dated April 29, 2013),
plus interest from April 29, 2013, plus attorneys fees of 18% of the additional just
compensation plus interest awarded in the judgment dated May 10, 2012; to pay the
judgments in "Board of Supervisors of LSU A&M College v. 1732 Canal St., LLC, et al",
bearing No. 10-10488, Sec. "8", Div. "N", on the docket of the Civil District Court, parish
of Orleans, state of La. and No. 2012-CA-1370 on the docket of the 4
th
 Circuit Court of
Appeal, state of La.
Effective July 1, 2014.