Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB56 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Page 1 of 1
Lopinto (HB 56)	Act No. 3
Existing law (Sunset) provides that the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections and all the
statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their
operations on July 1, 2014, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as
of July 1, 2015, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the
department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
New law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections
and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the "sunset" law.  New
law supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure for review and
re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the
department along with additional provisions.  New law makes July 1, 2021, the new
termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2020, unless the department is re-
created again.
Effective June 30, 2014.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(7)(a); Repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(f))