Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR13 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 14RS-376	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 3
Regular Session, 2014
HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON NO. 13
BY REPRESENTATIVE ST. GERMAIN
NATURAL RESOURCES DEPT:  Approves the 2014-2015 Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON1
To approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal Year 2014-2015, as adopted by2
the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and3
Restoration Authority.4
WHEREAS, R.S. 30:2000.1 et seq., provides for the creation, duties, and5
responsibilities of the Atchafalaya Basin Program, in the office of the secretary of the6
Department of Natural Resources, and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion7
Board; and8
WHEREAS, pursuant to R.S. 30:2000.11, a technical advisory group has been9
appointed to review, evaluate, and approve all water management and water quality projects10
proposed for inclusion in an annual plan to determine if the project meets the criteria for11
inclusion in the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan, and make recommendations to the12
Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board; and13
WHEREAS, public participation in the development of the Atchafalaya Basin14
Annual Plan is essential to the success of the Atchafalaya Basin Program; and 15
WHEREAS, nominations for water quality projects were accepted from July 1, 2012,16
through June 30, 2013, at which time the technical advisory group reviewed and evaluated17
the water quality projects that were nominated by the public and selected projects for18
inclusion in the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(B); and 19
WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan was then presented for public20
comment and discussion at meetings that were held on November 12, 2013, in Morgan City,21 HLS 14RS-376	ORIGINAL
HCR NO. 13
Page 2 of 3
Louisiana, on November 13, 2013, in St. Martinville, Louisiana, and on November 14, 2013,1
in Plaquemine, Louisiana; and2
WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board at a public3
meeting held on November 21, 2013, in Baton Rouge, Louisiana, after receiving and4
considering the comments of the public, and the recommendations of the Atchafalaya Basin5
Program staff, unanimously approved the draft Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan; and 6
WHEREAS, the draft Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan was submitted on December7
3, 2013, to the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority (CPRA) pursuant to R.S.8
30:2000.11(E) for their review and approval as consistent with the master plan for coastal9
protection and restoration for a sustainable coast and was unanimously approved by CPRA10
at its January 15, 2014, meeting; and 11
WHEREAS, at a public meeting held on January 22, 2014, the Atchafalaya Basin12
Research and Promotion Board, as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(D), considered and13
unanimously approved the proposed Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan in its final version; and14
WHEREAS, such committees must take action on the Atchafalaya Basin Annual15
Plan, and the legislature may approve or disapprove the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan by16
resolution adopted by a majority vote of the members of each house of the legislature; and17
WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan shall not be effective or18
implemented unless both houses of the legislature approve the annual plan or fail to19
disapprove the annual plan; and20
WHEREAS, the secretary shall implement the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan if the21
legislature approves the plan or if the legislature fails to timely disapprove of the plan.22
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby23
approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal Year 2014-2015, as presented by the24
secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and adopted by the Atchafalaya Basin25
Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority.26
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the27
secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and28
Promotion Board.29 HLS 14RS-376	ORIGINAL
HCR NO. 13
Page 3 of 3
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
St. Germain	HCR No. 13
Approves the 2014-2015 Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan.