ENROLLED Page 1 of 2 Regular Session, 2014 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON NO. 13 BY REPRESENTATIVE ST. GERMAIN A CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON To approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal Year 2014-2015, as adopted by the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority. WHEREAS, R.S. 30:2000.1 et seq., provides for the creation, duties, and responsibilities of the Atchafalaya Basin Program, in the office of the secretary of the Department of Natural Resources, and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board; and WHEREAS, pursuant to R.S. 30:2000.11, a technical advisory group has been appointed to review, evaluate, and approve all water management and water quality projects proposed for inclusion in an annual plan to determine if the project meets the criteria for inclusion in the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan, and make recommendations to the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board; and WHEREAS, public participation in the development of the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan is essential to the success of the Atchafalaya Basin Program; and WHEREAS, nominations for water quality projects were accepted from July 1, 2012, through June 30, 2013, at which time the technical advisory group reviewed and evaluated the water quality projects that were nominated by the public and selected projects for inclusion in the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(B); and WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan was then presented for public comment and discussion at meetings that were held on November 12, 2013, in Morgan City, Louisiana, on November 13, 2013, in St. Martinville, Louisiana, and on November 14, 2013, in Plaquemine, Louisiana; and WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board at a public meeting held on November 21, 2013, in Baton Rouge, Louisiana, after receiving and ENROLLEDHCR NO. 13 Page 2 of 2 considering the comments of the public, and the recommendations of the Atchafalaya Basin Program staff, unanimously approved the draft Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan; and WHEREAS, the draft Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan was submitted on December 3, 2013, to the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority (CPRA) pursuant to R.S. 30:2000.11(E) for their review and approval as consistent with the master plan for coastal protection and restoration for a sustainable coast and was unanimously approved by CPRA at its January 15, 2014, meeting; and WHEREAS, at a public meeting held on January 22, 2014, the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board, as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(D), considered and unanimously approved the proposed Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan in its final version; and WHEREAS, such committees must take action on the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan, and the legislature may approve or disapprove the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan by resolution adopted by a majority vote of the members of each house of the legislature; and WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan shall not be effective or implemented unless both houses of the legislature approve the annual plan or fail to disapprove the annual plan; and WHEREAS, the secretary shall implement the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan if the legislature approves the plan or if the legislature fails to timely disapprove of the plan. THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal Year 2014-2015, as presented by the secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and adopted by the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board. SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATI VES PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE