Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR198 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 14RS-5734	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 2
Regular Session, 2014
HOUSE RESOLUTION NO. 198
BY REPRESENTATIVE JOHNSON
COMMENDATIONS:  Commends Bunkie City Clerk Cynthia Dauzat upon her retirement
A RESOLUTION1
To commend Cynthia Dauzat upon the occasion of her retirement as city clerk for the City2
of Bunkie after thirty-two years of  service.3
WHEREAS, Cynthia Dauzat was hired as deputy city clerk for Bunkie on May 3,4
1982, and served in that position through September 13, 1993, when she was appointed city5
clerk for Bunkie on September 14, 1993; and 6
WHEREAS, at the time of her retirement on May thirty-first of this year, Cynthia7
Dauzat will have served the City of Bunkie for a total of thirty-two years; and 8
WHEREAS, during her time with the City of Bunkie, Cynthia Dauzat completed the9
annual Louisiana Clerks Institute held in Baton Rouge, Louisiana, where she received the10
designation of Certified Municipal Clerk from the International Institute of Municipal Clerks11
on November 4, 1988; and 12
WHEREAS, after further education through the Louisiana Clerks Institute and13
various regional meetings, Cynthia Dauzat was also awarded the title of Certified Municipal14
Clerk/Advanced Academy of Education on October 25, 1999, by the International Institute15
of Municipal Clerks; and 16
WHEREAS, on February 28, 2000, Cynthia Dauzat received the lifetime designation17
of Master Municipal Clerk from the International Institute of Municipal Clerks, a new18
designation and  the highest recognition that a city clerk can receive; and 19 HLS 14RS-5734	ORIGINAL
HR NO. 198
Page 2 of 2
WHEREAS, during her years as city clerk, Cynthia Dauzat also served as president1
of the Louisiana Municipal Clerks for the years 2000 to 2001, in addition to serving  on its2
various committees throughout the years; and 3
WHEREAS, Cynthia Dauzat also had the honor of  serving  as the city clerk board4
member on the Louisiana Municipal Advisory and Technical Services Board, along with5
mayors and aldermen throughout the state, from November 6, 2002, through May 31, 2014;6
and 7
WHEREAS, Cynthia Dauzat also served as president for four years, from 20068
through 2010, of such Louisiana Municipal Advisory and Technical Services Board, which9
has the responsibility of administering  the insurance premium tax and occupational license10
tax collection program for municipalities throughout this state; and 11
WHEREAS, on a personal level, Cynthia Dauzat has been a member of the Bunkie12
Rotary Club for nineteen years, since September 1994, serving as its president twice, from13
2001 to  2002 and  from 2010 to 2011; and14
WHEREAS, Cynthia Dauzat additionally became a Paul Harris Fellow on May 24,15
2010, and has served as chairman of Bunkie's Christmas Parade for the last several years.16
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the17
Legislature of Louisiana does hereby commend Cynthia Dauzat upon the occasion of her18
retirement as city clerk for the City of Bunkie after thirty-two years of service.19
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a suitable copy of this Resolution be transmitted20
to Cynthia Dauzat.21
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Johnson	HR No. 198
Commends Cynthia Dauzat upon the occasion of her retirement as Bunkie City Clerk after
32 years of service with the city.