Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB106 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    RDCSB106 1873 3917
Page 1 of 1
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Walsworth	SB No. 106
Present law provides for a special fund within the Employment Security Administration
Fund (i.e., the fund in which employers deposit their unemployment insurance taxes).
Present law provides that moneys from the special fund are to be used only for the purpose
of upgrading employee job skills through training.
Present law provides that the Incumbent Worker Training Program reauthorization shall be
expressly renewed by the legislature prior to July 1, 2014, in order for amounts to be charged
and credited to the Incumbent Worker Training Account in the following calendar year for
use in funding the program.
Proposed law extends the authorization of the Incumbent Worker Training Program 	from
July 1, 2014, to July 1, 2018.
Present law (Sunset) provides that the Louisiana Workforce Commission and all the
statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their
operations on July 1, 2014, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as
of July 1, 2015, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the
department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Louisiana Workforce Commission
and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the "sunset" law.
Proposed law supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure for
review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity
within the department along with additional provisions. Proposed law makes July 1, 2019,
the new termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2018, unless the department
is re-created again.
Effective June 30, 2014.
(Amends R.S. 23:1553(G); Adds R.S. 23:1514(E) and R.S. 49:191(7); Repeals R.S.
49:191(5)(e))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Labor and Industrial
Relations to the engrossed bill.
1. Added provisions to re-create the Louisiana Workforce Commission and to
change the termination date for the commission to July 1, 2018.