Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB239 Introduced / Bill

                    SLS 14RS-610	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
Regular Session, 2014
SENATE BILL NO. 239
BY SENATOR WALSWORTH 
SUNSET LAW.  Re-creates the Department of Environmental Quality.  (6/30/14)
AN ACT1
To enact R.S. 49:191(6)(h) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(5)(h), relative to the Department of2
Environmental Quality, including provisions to provide for the re-creation of the3
Department of Environmental Quality and the statutory entities made a part of the4
department by law; to provide for the effective termination date for all statutory5
authority for the existence of such statutory entities; and to provide for related6
matters.7
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:8
Section 1.  Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of Environmental Quality and9
the statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective June10
30, 2014, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with the provisions11
of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.12
Section 2.  All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of 13
Environmental Quality and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created14
by Section 1 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2017, pursuant to R.S. 49:191.  However,15
the Department of Environmental Quality may be re-created prior to such date in accordance16
with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of17 SB NO. 239
SLS 14RS-610	ORIGINAL
Page 2 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
1950.1
Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that2
those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.3
Section 4.  R.S. 49:191(6)(h) is hereby enacted to read as follows:4
ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities;5
phase-out period for statutory entities; table of dates6
Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the7
legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their8
operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority9
for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of10
July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:11
*          *          *12
(6)  July 1, 2016:13
*          *          *14
(h) The Department of Environmental Quality and all statutory entities15
made a part of the department by law.16
Section 5.  R.S. 49:191(5)(h) is hereby repealed.17
Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2014; if vetoed by the18
governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on19
June 30, 2014, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.20
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Heyward Jeffers.
DIGEST
Walsworth (SB)
Present law (Sunset law) provides that the Dept. of Environmental Quality and all the
statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their
operations on July 30, 2014, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as
of July 1, 2015, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the
department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Environmental Quality and
its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2014, for a two-year period.  SB NO. 239
SLS 14RS-610	ORIGINAL
Page 3 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
Effective June 30, 2014.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(6)(h); repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(h))