Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB261 Enrolled / Bill

                    Page 1 of 4
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
Regular Session, 2014	ENROLLED
SENATE BILL NO. 261
BY SENATORS JOHNS, MORRISH AND JOHN SMITH AND REPRESENTATIVES
DANAHAY, FRANKLIN, GEYMANN, GUINN, KLECKLEY AND
HILL 
AN ACT1
To amend and reenact R.S. 34:202(A), relative to the Lake Charles Harbor and Terminal2
District; to provide relative to the board of commissioners; and to provide for related3
matters.4
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:5
Section 1.  R.S. 34:202(A) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows:6
ยง202. Lake Charles Harbor and Terminal District; ratification; board of7
commissioners; members; officers; agents; and employees8
A.(1) The governing authority of the district shall be a board of9
commissioners which shall be known as the Board of Commissioners of the Lake10
Charles Harbor and Terminal District. The board shall consist of seven members11
who shall be citizens of the United States and qualified voters, and inhabitants of this12
district during their terms of office.13
(2)(a) The governor shall appoint seven commissioners, subject to Senate14
confirmation. Except for initial appointments and terms, which are provided for in15
Subparagraph (b) of this Paragraph, Effective August 1, 2015, commissioners shall16
serve four-year terms staggered terms of four years, which begin on August first17
of the appointment year and expire on July thirty-first in the fourth year18
following the appointment year, and shall be appointed from nominations as19
follows:20
(i)(a) One of the successors to the two members serving initial terms as21
provided in Item (b)(i) of this Paragraph shall be appointed from a list of three22
nominees submitted by the governing authority of Lake Charles and the other from23 SB NO. 261	ENROLLED
Page 2 of 4
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
a list of three nominees submitted by the governing authority of Calcasieu Parish1
member, designated as Position A, shall be appointed from a list of three2
nominees submitted by the governing authority of the city of Westlake.3
(ii)(b) One of the successors to the two members serving initial terms as4
provided in Item (b)(ii) of this Paragraph member, designated as Position B, shall5
be appointed from a list of three nominees submitted by the governing authority of6
Westlake and the other from a list of three nominees submitted by the governing7
authority of Cameron Parish.8
(iii)(c) Successors to the three members serving initial terms as provided in9
Item (b)(iii) of this Paragraph shall be appointed from a list of nominees submitted10
jointly by the state legislators who represent any part of the district One member,11
designated as Position C, shall be appointed from a list of three nominees12
submitted by the governing authority of the city of Lake Charles.13
(d) One member, designated as Position D, shall be appointed from a list14
of three nominees submitted by the governing authority of Calcasieu Parish.15
(e) Three members, designated as positions E, F, and G, shall be16
appointed from a list of nominees submitted jointly by the state legislators who17
represent any part of the district.18
(b) All seven initial appointments after May 29, 2003 shall be made from a19
list of nominees submitted jointly by the state legislators who represent any part of20
the district. A vacancy in an initial term prior to the expiration of the term shall be21
filled in the same manner as these initial appointments. Initial terms, as determined22
by lot at the first meeting, shall be as follows:23
(i) Two members shall serve two years.24
(ii) Two members shall serve three years.25
(iii) Three members shall serve four years.26
(3) Except as otherwise provided by Paragraph (2) of this Subsection,27
Effective August 1, 2014, any vacancy whether by reason of death, resignation,28
expiration of term, or any other cause in the membership of the board shall be29
filled for the remainder of any unexpired term, in the same manner as the person30 SB NO. 261	ENROLLED
Page 3 of 4
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
vacating the position was appointed as provided in Paragraph (2) of this1
Subsection. Not later than ten calendar days after the occurrence of a vacancy2
on the board for any cause, the president or other presiding officer of the board3
shall send notice of the vacancy by registered or certified United States mail to4
the appropriate nominating authority. The nominating authority shall submit5
its nominations to the governor no later than sixty calendar days after6
occurrence of the vacancy. If a nominating authority fails to submit7
nominations to the governor within one hundred twenty calendar days after8
occurrence of the vacancy, the governor shall forthwith make an appointment9
to fill the vacancy.10
(4) Nominations from the legislative delegation for positions E, F, and G11
and appointments by the governor from those nominations shall be made so that the12
composition of the board includes at least two members of a racial minority or one13
member of a racial minority and one woman.14
(5) No member shall serve more than two and one-half terms in three15
consecutive terms. After having served at least two and one-half terms in three16
consecutive terms, a commissioner shall not be eligible for appointment to the board17
for a period of eight twelve years after completion of the second term that service18
on the board.19
(6) Members shall continue to serve until their successors have been20
appointed and take office.21
*          *          *22
Section 2.(A) Notwithstanding any other provision of the law to the contrary, the23
term of members holding positions designated by this Act as A and B on the Lake Charles24
Harbor and Terminal District board of commissioners on the effective date of this Act shall25
be extended and shall expire on August 1, 2015. 26
(B) Notwithstanding any other provision of the law to the contrary, the term of27
members holding positions designated by this Act as E, F, and G on the Lake Charles Harbor28
and Terminal District board of commissioners on the effective date of this Act shall be29
extended and shall expire on August 1, 2016. 30 SB NO. 261	ENROLLED
Page 4 of 4
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
(C) Notwithstanding any other provision of the law to the contrary, the term of1
members holding positions designated by this Act as C and D on the Lake Charles Harbor2
and Terminal District board of commissioners on the effective date of this Act shall be3
extended and shall expire on August 1, 2017.4
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF LOUISIANA
APPROVED: