Page 1 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. Regular Session, 2014 ENROLLED SENATE BILL NO. 261 BY SENATORS JOHNS, MORRISH AND JOHN SMITH AND REPRESENTATIVES DANAHAY, FRANKLIN, GEYMANN, GUINN, KLECKLEY AND HILL AN ACT1 To amend and reenact R.S. 34:202(A), relative to the Lake Charles Harbor and Terminal2 District; to provide relative to the board of commissioners; and to provide for related3 matters.4 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:5 Section 1. R.S. 34:202(A) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows:6 ยง202. Lake Charles Harbor and Terminal District; ratification; board of7 commissioners; members; officers; agents; and employees8 A.(1) The governing authority of the district shall be a board of9 commissioners which shall be known as the Board of Commissioners of the Lake10 Charles Harbor and Terminal District. The board shall consist of seven members11 who shall be citizens of the United States and qualified voters, and inhabitants of this12 district during their terms of office.13 (2)(a) The governor shall appoint seven commissioners, subject to Senate14 confirmation. Except for initial appointments and terms, which are provided for in15 Subparagraph (b) of this Paragraph, Effective August 1, 2015, commissioners shall16 serve four-year terms staggered terms of four years, which begin on August first17 of the appointment year and expire on July thirty-first in the fourth year18 following the appointment year, and shall be appointed from nominations as19 follows:20 (i)(a) One of the successors to the two members serving initial terms as21 provided in Item (b)(i) of this Paragraph shall be appointed from a list of three22 nominees submitted by the governing authority of Lake Charles and the other from23 ACT No. 485 SB NO. 261 ENROLLED Page 2 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. a list of three nominees submitted by the governing authority of Calcasieu Parish1 member, designated as Position A, shall be appointed from a list of three2 nominees submitted by the governing authority of the city of Westlake.3 (ii)(b) One of the successors to the two members serving initial terms as4 provided in Item (b)(ii) of this Paragraph member, designated as Position B, shall5 be appointed from a list of three nominees submitted by the governing authority of6 Westlake and the other from a list of three nominees submitted by the governing7 authority of Cameron Parish.8 (iii)(c) Successors to the three members serving initial terms as provided in9 Item (b)(iii) of this Paragraph shall be appointed from a list of nominees submitted10 jointly by the state legislators who represent any part of the district One member,11 designated as Position C, shall be appointed from a list of three nominees12 submitted by the governing authority of the city of Lake Charles.13 (d) One member, designated as Position D, shall be appointed from a list14 of three nominees submitted by the governing authority of Calcasieu Parish.15 (e) Three members, designated as positions E, F, and G, shall be16 appointed from a list of nominees submitted jointly by the state legislators who17 represent any part of the district.18 (b) All seven initial appointments after May 29, 2003 shall be made from a19 list of nominees submitted jointly by the state legislators who represent any part of20 the district. A vacancy in an initial term prior to the expiration of the term shall be21 filled in the same manner as these initial appointments. Initial terms, as determined22 by lot at the first meeting, shall be as follows:23 (i) Two members shall serve two years.24 (ii) Two members shall serve three years.25 (iii) Three members shall serve four years.26 (3) Except as otherwise provided by Paragraph (2) of this Subsection,27 Effective August 1, 2014, any vacancy whether by reason of death, resignation,28 expiration of term, or any other cause in the membership of the board shall be29 filled for the remainder of any unexpired term, in the same manner as the person30 SB NO. 261 ENROLLED Page 3 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. vacating the position was appointed as provided in Paragraph (2) of this1 Subsection. Not later than ten calendar days after the occurrence of a vacancy2 on the board for any cause, the president or other presiding officer of the board3 shall send notice of the vacancy by registered or certified United States mail to4 the appropriate nominating authority. The nominating authority shall submit5 its nominations to the governor no later than sixty calendar days after6 occurrence of the vacancy. If a nominating authority fails to submit7 nominations to the governor within one hundred twenty calendar days after8 occurrence of the vacancy, the governor shall forthwith make an appointment9 to fill the vacancy.10 (4) Nominations from the legislative delegation for positions E, F, and G11 and appointments by the governor from those nominations shall be made so that the12 composition of the board includes at least two members of a racial minority or one13 member of a racial minority and one woman.14 (5) No member shall serve more than two and one-half terms in three15 consecutive terms. After having served at least two and one-half terms in three16 consecutive terms, a commissioner shall not be eligible for appointment to the board17 for a period of eight twelve years after completion of the second term that service18 on the board.19 (6) Members shall continue to serve until their successors have been20 appointed and take office.21 * * *22 Section 2.(A) Notwithstanding any other provision of the law to the contrary, the23 term of members holding positions designated by this Act as A and B on the Lake Charles24 Harbor and Terminal District board of commissioners on the effective date of this Act shall25 be extended and shall expire on August 1, 2015. 26 (B) Notwithstanding any other provision of the law to the contrary, the term of27 members holding positions designated by this Act as E, F, and G on the Lake Charles Harbor28 and Terminal District board of commissioners on the effective date of this Act shall be29 extended and shall expire on August 1, 2016. 30 SB NO. 261 ENROLLED Page 4 of 4 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. (C) Notwithstanding any other provision of the law to the contrary, the term of1 members holding positions designated by this Act as C and D on the Lake Charles Harbor2 and Terminal District board of commissioners on the effective date of this Act shall be3 extended and shall expire on August 1, 2017.4 PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF LOUISIANA APPROVED: