The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Sharon F. Lyles. DIGEST Johns (SB 261) Present law provides that the governing authority of the Lake Charles Harbor and Terminal District is a seven member board of commissioners who are citizens of the United States, qualified voters, and inhabitants of the district during their four year term of office. Commissioners are appointed by the governor, subject to Senate confirmation. Except for initial appointments after May 29, 2003, members are nominated as follows: (1)One member from a list of three nominees submitted by the governing authority of Lake Charles. (2)One member from a list of three nominees submitted by the governing authority of Calcasieu Parish. (3)One member from a list of three nominees submitted by the governing authority of Westlake. (4)One member from a list of three nominees submitted by the governing authority of Cameron Parish. (5)Three members from a list of three nominees submitted jointly by state legislators who represent any part of the district. Proposed law retains and reorganizes present law for nominees and appointments to the board and removes provisions for initial appointments and terms. Proposed law provides for filling a vacancy for any reason, effective August 1, 2014, in the same manner as the vacant position. Requires the president or other presiding officer of the board to send notice of the vacancy by registered or certified U. S. mail to the appropriate nominating authority not later than 10 calendar days after occurrence of the vacancy for any cause. Requires such nominating authority to submit its nominations to the governor no later than 60 calendar days after occurrence of the vacancy. Requires the governor to fill the vacancy if a nominating authority fails to submit nominations 120 calendar days after occurrence of the vacancy. Proposed law designates legislative appointments and retains present law which requires legislative nominations and appointments by the governor from such nominations to be made so that the board includes at least two members of a racial minority or one member of a racial minority and one woman. Present law provides that commissioners are limited to two consecutive terms and are not eligible for appointment to the board for a period of eight years after completion of the second term. Proposed law changes present law to provide that commissioners are limited to three consecutive terms and are not eligible for appointment to the board for a period of 12 years after completion of the third term, except that a commissioner who is appointed to fill more than one-half of an unexpired term may serve three consecutive terms in addition to such partial term. Proposed law requires members to serve until their successors have been appointed and take office. Proposed law prohibits any member from holding any office in any political party or other political organization or any public office or employment for compensation existing under or created by the laws of the U. S. or the state, or existing under or created by the charter or ordinance of a municipality or subdivision of the state. Proposed law extends the term of serving commissioners holding positions A and B on the board until August 1, 2015. Proposed law extends the term of serving commissioners holding positions E, F, and G on the board until August 1, 2016. Proposed law extends the term of serving commissioners holding positions C and D on the board until August 1, 2017. Effective August 1, 2014. (Amends R.S. 34:202(A))