Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB261 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    The original instrument was prepared by Sharon F. Lyles. The following digest,
which does not constitute a part of the legislative instrument, was prepared by
Cathy R. Wells.
DIGEST
Johns (SB 261)
Present law provides that the governing authority of the Lake Charles Harbor and Terminal
District is a seven member board of commissioners who are citizens of the United States,
qualified voters, and inhabitants of the district during their four year term of office.
Commissioners are appointed by the governor, subject to Senate confirmation.  Except for initial
appointments after May 29, 2003, members are nominated as follows:
(1)One member from a list of three nominees submitted by the governing authority of Lake
Charles.
(2)One member from a list of three nominees submitted by the governing authority of
Calcasieu Parish.
(3)One member from a list of three nominees submitted by the governing authority of
Westlake.
(4)One member from a list of three nominees submitted by the governing authority of
Cameron Parish.
(5)Three members from a list of three nominees submitted jointly by state legislators who
represent any part of the district.
Proposed law retains and reorganizes present law for nominees and appointments to the board
and removes provisions for initial appointments and terms.
Proposed law provides for filling a vacancy for any reason, effective August 1, 2014, in the same
manner as the vacant position. Requires the president or other presiding officer of the board to
send notice of the vacancy by registered or certified U. S. mail to the appropriate nominating
authority not later than 10 calendar days after occurrence of the vacancy for any cause. Requires
such nominating authority to submit its nominations to the governor no later than 60 calendar
days after occurrence of the vacancy. Requires the governor to fill the vacancy if a nominating
authority fails to submit nominations 120 calendar days after occurrence of the vacancy. 
Proposed law designates legislative appointments and retains present law which requires
legislative nominations and appointments by the governor from such nominations to be made so
that the board includes at least two members of a racial minority or one member of a racial
minority and one woman. Present law provides that commissioners are limited to two consecutive terms and are not eligible
for appointment to the board for a period of eight years after completion of the second term.
Proposed law changes present law to provide that commissioners are limited to two and one-half
terms in three consecutive terms and are not eligible for appointment to the board for a period of
12 years after completion of two and one-half terms in the three consecutive terms.
Proposed law requires members to serve until their successors have been appointed and take
office.
Proposed law extends the term of serving commissioners holding positions A and B on the board
until August 1, 2015. 
Proposed law extends the term of serving commissioners holding positions E, F, and G on the
board until August 1, 2016. 
Proposed law extends the term of serving commissioners holding positions C and D on the board
until August 1, 2017. 
Effective August 1, 2014.
(Amends R.S. 34:202(A))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate
Senate Floor Amendments to engrossed bill
1. Change  the requirements of term limits for commissioners.
2. Removes prohibition on board members holding any office in any political party
or other political organization or any public office or employment for
compensation existing under or created by the laws of the U. S. or the state, or
existing under or created by the charter or ordinance of a municipality or
subdivision of the state.