Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB261 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Johns (SB 261)	Act No. 485
Prior law provided that the governing authority of the Lake Charles Harbor and Terminal
District is a seven member board of commissioners who are citizens of the United States,
qualified voters, and inhabitants of the district during their four year term of office.
Commissioners are appointed by the governor, subject to Senate confirmation.  Except for
initial appointments after May 29, 2003, members are nominated as follows:
(1)One member from a list of three nominees submitted by the governing authority of
Lake Charles.
(2)One member from a list of three nominees submitted by the governing authority of
Calcasieu Parish.
(3)One member from a list of three nominees submitted by the governing authority of
Westlake.
(4)One member from a list of three nominees submitted by the governing authority of
Cameron Parish.
(5)Three members from a list of three nominees submitted jointly by state legislators
who represent any part of the district.
New law retains and reorganizes prior law for nominees and appointments to the board and
removes provisions for initial appointments and terms.
New law provides for filling a vacancy for any reason, effective August 1, 2014, in the same
manner as the vacant position. Requires the president or other presiding officer of the board
to send notice of the vacancy by registered or certified U. S. mail to the appropriate
nominating authority not later than 10 calendar days after occurrence of the vacancy for any
cause. Requires such nominating authority to submit its nominations to the governor no later
than 60 calendar days after occurrence of the vacancy. Requires the governor to fill the
vacancy if a nominating authority fails to submit nominations 120 calendar days after
occurrence of the vacancy. 
New law designates legislative appointments and retains prior law which requires legislative
nominations and appointments by the governor from such nominations to be made so that
the board includes at least two members of a racial minority or one member of a racial
minority and one woman.
Prior law provides that commissioners are limited to two consecutive terms and are not
eligible for appointment to the board for a period of eight years after completion of the
second term.
New law changes prior law to provide that commissioners are limited to two and one-half
terms in three consecutive terms and are not eligible for appointment to the board for a
period of 12 years after completion of two and one-half terms in the three consecutive terms.
New law requires members to serve until their successors have been appointed and take
office.
New law extends the term of serving commissioners holding positions A and B on the board
until August 1, 2015. 
New law extends the term of serving commissioners holding positions E, F, and G on the
board until August 1, 2016. 
New law extends the term of serving commissioners holding positions C and D on the board
until August 1, 2017.
Effective August 1, 2014.
(Amends R.S. 34:202(A))